Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePoulsen v. Department of Defense et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2017cv03531
Date Filed2017-06-19
Date Closed2019-03-22
JudgeJudge William H. Orrick
PlaintiffKevin Poulsen
DefendantDepartment of Defense
DefendantOffice of the Director of National Intelligence
DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2017-06-191COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11483479.). Filed byKevin Poulsen. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaupp, William) (Filed on 6/19/2017) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-192Proposed Summons. (Kaupp, William) (Filed on 6/19/2017) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-203Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/5/2017. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2017) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-234Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-23Electronic filing error. Only one summons may be issued. Please re-file one summons listing all defendants and in its entirety. Re: 2 Proposed Summons filed by Kevin Poulsen (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-235Proposed Summons. (Kaupp, William) (Filed on 6/23/2017) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-236Summons Issued as to Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-06-267CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kevin Poulsen.. (Kaupp, William) (Filed on 6/26/2017) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-268Certificate of Interested Entities by Kevin Poulsen (Kaupp, William) (Filed on 6/26/2017) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-269CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kevin Poulsen of Summons, Complaint and other documents on the Defendants (Kaupp, William) (Filed on 6/26/2017) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-07-1310NOTICE of Change of Address by William Gordon Kaupp (Kaupp, William) (Filed on 7/13/2017) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-1811NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Powell (Powell, Amy) (Filed on 7/18/2017) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-1812STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence and Kevin Poulsen. (Powell, Amy) (Filed on 7/18/2017) Modified on 7/18/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-1813NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen Flynn (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 7/18/2017) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
2017-07-2114CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Consent/Declination due by 8/4/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 8/4/2017. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-08-0415CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.. (Powell, Amy) (Filed on 8/4/2017) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
2017-08-0716CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-0717ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/7/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-0718CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/07/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-08-1619ANSWER to 1 Complaint; by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Powell, Amy) (Filed on 8/16/2017) Modified on 8/17/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/16/2017)
2017-08-1620CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kevin Poulsen re 18 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Kaupp, William) (Filed on 8/16/2017) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
2017-08-2921STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Seeking Administrative Relief from ADR Assignment Per ADR Rule 3.3(c) filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Powell, Amy) (Filed on 8/29/2017) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
2017-08-2922ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Kaupp, William) (Filed on 8/29/2017) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
2017-08-2923NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Kaupp, William) (Filed on 8/29/2017) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
2017-08-3024Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 21 Stipulation Seeking Relief from ADR Assignment. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2017) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
2017-09-0625STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Powell, Amy) (Filed on 9/6/2017) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
2017-09-0826Order by Hon. William H. Orrick granting 25 Stipulation. Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
2017-10-1027JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & [PROPOSED] ORDER ; filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Powell, Amy) (Filed on 10/10/2017) Modified on 10/11/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/10/2017)
2017-10-1228CLERK'S NOTICE - Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2017 is VACATED. Dispositive motions to be heard on 1/31/2018 at 2:00 p.m. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2017) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
2017-11-0229STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Scheduling Order filed by Kevin Poulsen. (Kaupp, William) (Filed on 11/2/2017) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
2017-11-0630Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 29 Stipulation. Case Management Statement due by 2/14/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2017) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
2017-11-1731MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 12/15/2017. Replies due by 1/12/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Hardy (FBI) and Exhibits, # 2 Declaration of G. Weinsheimer (NSD), # 3 Exhibits to Weinsheimer Declaration, # 4 Declaration of Paul Colborn (OLC), # 5 Exhibits to Colburn Declaration, # 6 Declaration of Patricia Gaviria (ODNI), # 7 Exhibits to Gaviria Declaration, # 8 Declaration of David Sherman (NSA) and Exhibits, # 9 Proposed Order)(Powell, Amy) (Filed on 11/17/2017) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-12-1532ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER Leave to Exceed Page Limit By Two Pages ; filed by Kevin Poulsen. Responses due by 12/19/2017. (Kaupp, William) (Filed on 12/15/2017) Modified on 12/18/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-1533OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 32 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to Exceed Page Limit By Two Pages ) filed byKevin Poulsen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Kaupp, William) (Filed on 12/15/2017) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
2017-12-1834Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 32 Administrative Motion to Exceed Page Limit. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
2018-01-1135STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Seeking Extension of Time to File Reply filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Amy Powell)(Powell, Amy) (Filed on 1/11/2018) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
2018-01-1636Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 35 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2018) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-1737REPLY (re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byDepartment of Defense, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Powell, Amy) (Filed on 1/17/2018) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-2438CLERK'S NOTICE Resetting Deadlines as to 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing continued to 2/21/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2018) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-02-0639Request for Judicial Notice filed byKevin Poulsen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Letter by White House Counsel, # 2 Exhibit 2 - The Nunes Memo, # 3 Exhibit 3- Presidential Tweets, # 4 Proposed Order)(Kaupp, William) (Filed on 2/6/2018) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
2018-02-1240STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Scheduling Order filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Powell, Amy) (Filed on 2/12/2018) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
2018-02-1341Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 40 Stipulation. Case Management Statements due by 2/13/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2018) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-02-1542ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER to Withdraw MSJ and Postpone Hearing re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. Responses due by 2/20/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Amy Powell)(Powell, Amy) (Filed on 2/15/2018) Modified on 2/16/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-1543OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 42 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Withdraw MSJ and Postpone Hearing re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byKevin Poulsen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Kaupp, William) (Filed on 2/15/2018) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-1644ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick granting 42 Administrative Motion requesting to withdraw 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/27/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 3/20/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2018) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-03-2045CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT , jointly filed filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Hardy)(Powell, Amy) (Filed on 3/20/2018) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-2746Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 3/27/2018. Plaintiff shall file a motion for summary adjudication regarding NSA's and ODNI's Glomar responses by May 11, 2018. The Government may respond by June 8, plaintiff may reply by June 22, and the hearing on the motion shall be set for July 11, 2018 at 2:00 p.m.A Joint Status Report due ls by 8/3/2018. FTR Time: 2:14-2:30. Plaintiff Attorney: William Gordon Kaupp. Defendant Attorney: Amy Powell. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/27/2018) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
2018-05-1147NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Louise Feinberg (Feinberg, Beth) (Filed on 5/11/2018) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-1148MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Kevin Poulsen. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 6/8/2018. Replies due by 6/22/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of W. Gordon Kaupp, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Proposed Order)(Kaupp, William) (Filed on 5/11/2018) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-1849STATUS REPORT by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Powell, Amy) (Filed on 5/18/2018) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
2018-06-0850Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 6/22/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patricia Gaviria, ODNI, # 2 Combined Exhibits to Gaviria Declaration, # 3 Declaration of Steven E. Thompson, NSA, # 4 Combined Exhibits to Thompson Declaration)(Powell, Amy) (Filed on 6/8/2018) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
2018-06-2251Ex Parte ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER Exceed Page Limits filed by Kevin Poulsen. Responses due by 6/26/2018. (Kaupp, William) (Filed on 6/22/2018) Modified on 6/25/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/22/2018)
2018-06-2252REPLY (re 48 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , 50 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment , 51 Ex Parte ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Exceed Page Limits ) filed byKevin Poulsen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Kaupp, William) (Filed on 6/22/2018) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
2018-06-2653Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 51 Administrative Motion to Exceed Page Limit. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2018) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
2018-07-0354CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to 48 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and 50 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment. The motion hearings previously noticed for 7/11/2018, are reschedule for Wednesday, 8/22/2018, at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2018) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
2018-07-1055STIPULATION to Continue Summary Judgment Hearing Date filed by Kevin Poulsen. (Kaupp, William) (Filed on 7/10/2018) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-1256CLERK'S NOTICE - Reset Motion Hearing as to 48 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and 50 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing reset for 9/5/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2018) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-08-0357CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT jointly filed filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Powell, Amy) (Filed on 8/3/2018) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
2018-08-0658CLERK'S NOTICE - Further Case Management Conference set for 9/5/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2018) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
2018-09-0459Request for Judicial Notice filed byKevin Poulsen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Nunes Memo), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Letter by White House Counsel), # 3 Exhibit 3 (President Trump's tweets), # 4 Exhibit 4 (Appointment of Special Counsel), # 5 Exhibit 5 (Statement of Offense - USA v. Papadopoulos), # 6 Exhibit 6 (Statement of Offense - USA v. Flynn), # 7 Exhibit 7 (Carter Page FISA materials))(Kaupp, William) (Filed on 9/4/2018) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-0560Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference held on 9/5/2018. The Court imposes a case management schedule. Total Time in Court: 36 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorneys: Gordon Kaupp and Colleen Flynn. Defendant Attorney: Amy Powell. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/5/2018) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
2018-09-2861Request for Judicial Notice Supplemental filed byKevin Poulsen. (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 9/28/2018) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-10-1962STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Amy Powell)(Powell, Amy) (Filed on 10/19/2018) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-2263ORDER EXTEND TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William H. Orrick granting 62 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-11-0864STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER , seeking administrative relief to expand page limits filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Powell, Amy) (Filed on 11/8/2018) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-0965NOTICE by Department of Justice of Lodging Classified Materials in Support of DOJ's Forthcoming Motion for Summary Judgment (Powell, Amy) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-0966MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Justice. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 12/7/2018. Replies due by 12/21/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David M. Hardy of FBI (REDACTED), # 2 Declaration of Patrick N. Findlay of NSD, # 3 Declaration of Paul Colborn of OLC, # 4 Proposed Order)(Powell, Amy) (Filed on 11/9/2018) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-1367Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 64 Stipulation to exceed page limits. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2018) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-12-0768OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byKevin Poulsen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Kaupp, William) (Filed on 12/7/2018) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-2069STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to expand page limits for DOJ's reply filed by Department of Justice. (Powell, Amy) (Filed on 12/20/2018) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2018-12-2170REPLY (re 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byDepartment of Justice. (Powell, Amy) (Filed on 12/21/2018) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2018-12-2771Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 69 Stipulation Seeking Administrative Relief to Expand Page Limits. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2018) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2019-01-0772MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue Hearing on Defendant DOJ's Motion for Summary Judgment, in Light of Lapse of Appropriations filed by Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Counsel)(Powell, Amy) (Filed on 1/7/2019) Modified on 1/8/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-0773OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 72 MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendant DOJ's Motion for Summary Judgment, in Light of Lapse of Appropriations ) filed byKevin Poulsen. (Kaupp, William) (Filed on 1/7/2019) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-0774ORDER granting 72 MOTION to Continue Hearing as to 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing continued to 2/6/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/07/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2019) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-0875CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING HEARING TIME - Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2019 as to 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment will commence at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2019) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-02-0676Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 2/6/2019 re 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion taken under submission; written order to follow. Total Time in Court: 26 minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney: W, Gordon Kaupp. Defendant Attorney: Amy Powell. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/6/2019) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-02-1477NOTICE by Department of Justice of Second Classified Lodging (Powell, Amy) (Filed on 2/14/2019) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-03-2278ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 3/22/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-2279JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/22/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-2880STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CHANGE TIME TO FILE ATTORNEY FEE MOTION filed by Kevin Poulsen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Colleen Flynn, # 2 Proposed Order)(Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 3/28/2019) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-03-2881Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 80 Stipulation. The deadline to file a motion for attorney fees is extended from April 5, 2019 to April 26, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-04-2682MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Kevin Poulsen. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 5/10/2019. Replies due by 5/17/2019. (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 4/26/2019) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-2683Declaration of Gordon Kaupp in Support of 82 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed byKevin Poulsen. (Related document(s) 82 ) (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 4/26/2019) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-2684Declaration of Colleen Flynn in Support of 82 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed byKevin Poulsen. (Related document(s) 82 ) (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 4/26/2019) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-2685Declaration in Support of 82 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed byKevin Poulsen. (Related document(s) 82 ) (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 4/26/2019) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-2686Declaration of Carol Sobel in Support of 82 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed byKevin Poulsen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) 82 ) (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 4/26/2019) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-2987Proposed Order re 82 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Kevin Poulsen. (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 4/29/2019) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-05-0688STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER extending time to file opposition and continuing hearing date filed by Department of Defense, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Amy E. Powell)(Powell, Amy) (Filed on 5/6/2019) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
2019-05-1389Order to Extend Time by Judge William H. Orrick granting 88 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-1790STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 82 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Kevin Poulsen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 5/17/2019) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
2019-05-1791OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 82 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs ) filed byDepartment of Defense, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Amy E. Powell with Exhibit)(Powell, Amy) (Filed on 5/17/2019) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
2019-05-2092Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 90 Stipulation. Replies due by 6/11/2019. Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
2019-06-1193REPLY (re 82 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs ) filed byKevin Poulsen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Colleen Flynn, # 2 Declaration of Gordon Kaupp)(Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 6/11/2019) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-2194ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick denying 82 Motion for Attorney Fees.(wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-07-1995NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Kevin Poulsen. Appeal of Order on Motion for Attorney Fees 94 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-13538470 paid.) (Flynn, Colleen) (Filed on 7/19/2019) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-07-2296USCA Case Number 19-16430 U.S. Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit for 95 Notice of Appeal filed by Kevin Poulsen. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar