Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePICHARDO-MARTINEZ v. UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02674
Date Filed2018-10-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffANGEL PICHARDO-MARTINEZ
DefendantUNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-29Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 10/29/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zrdj) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-10-291COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE filed by ANGEL PICHARDO-MARTINEZ.(zrdj) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-10-292MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANGEL PICHARDO-MARTINEZ (zrdj) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-10-293PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by ANGEL PICHARDO-MARTINEZ (zrdj) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-10-294MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ANGEL PICHARDO-MARTINEZ (See docket entry 1 to view document)(zrdj) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-12-035ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $70.98 from Prison Account of ANGEL PICHARDO-MARTINEZ and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 12/3/2018. (zmd) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-036ORDER denying 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/3/2018. (zmd) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-12Case Reassigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zmd) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2019-01-02Partial Filing Fee Received from ANGEL PICHARDO-MARTINEZ in the amount of $70.98, receipt number: 4616096119. (zrdj) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-15Partial Filing Fee Received from ANGEL PICHARDO-MARTINEZ in the amount of $52.00, receipt number: 4616096276. (zrdj) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-177SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zef, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-288RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/22/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/21/2019.) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/22/2019. (tth) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-02-14Partial Filing Fee Received from ANGEL PICHARDO-MARTINEZ in the amount of $43.94, receipt number: 4616096721. (zrdj) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-159STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/15/2019. (lctnm2) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-1510NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of All Defendants (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-2111ANSWER to 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE.(Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-22MINUTE ORDER. The Defendant has filed an Answer to the Plaintiff's Complaint brought under the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA). The Defendant denies receiving the Plaintiff's FOIA request and argues that the Plaintiff has not exhausted administrative remedies. Accordingly, the Defendant shall, by March 22, 2019, file a dispositive motion. The Plaintiff must file an opposition to the Defendant's motion on or before April 22. The Defendant may reply by May 6, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/22/2019. (lctnm2) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-02-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's dispositive motion due by 3/22/2019. Plaintiff's opposition due by 4/22/2019. Defendant's reply due by 5/6/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-03-11Partial Filing Fee Received from Angel Pichardo-Martinez in the amount of $48.15, receipt number: 4616097095. (tth) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-2212MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sophia Y. Kil)(Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-2613ORDER advising that if Plaintiff fails to respond to Defendant's 12 Motion for Summary Judgment by April 22, 2019, the Court may consider the motion as conceded. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/26/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 03/26/2019)
2019-03-2915RESPONSE re 11 Answer to Complaint filed by ANGEL PICHARDO-MARTINEZ. (jf) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-0114RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE served on 3/13/2019. (tth) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-09Partial Filing Fee Received from ANGEL PICHARDO-MARTINEZ in the amount of $90.40, receipt number: 4616097523. (zrdj) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-1116RESPONSE re 11 Answer to Complaint filed by ANGEL PICHARDO-MARTINEZ. (tth) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-1117AFFIDAVIT of Mailing re 16 Response to Document by ANGEL PICHARDO-MARTINEZ. (tth) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-05-15Partial Filing Fee Received from ANGEL PICHARDO-MARTINEZ in the amount of $44.53, receipt number: 4616098089. (zrdj) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
2019-07-0318ORDER denying 12 Motion for Summary Judgment. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 07/03/2019. (lctnm2) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Service's Renewed Motion Summary Judgment due by 8/8/2019. Mr. Pichardo-Martinez's Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/6/2019. Service's combined Opposition and Reply due by 9/27/2019. Mr. Pichardo-Martinez's Reply due by 10/18/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 07/05/2019)
2019-08-0519MOTION for Extension of Time to File Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
2019-08-05MINUTE ORDER granting 19 Motion for an Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment on or before August 16, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/5/2019. (lctnm1) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
2019-08-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/16/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
2019-08-1620MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) by UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Declaration of Sophia Y. Kill and Exhibits)(Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 08/16/2019)
2019-08-1921ORDER advising that if Plaintiff fails to respond to Defendant's 20 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by September 23, 2019, the Court may consider any factual assertions in the Defendant's affidavits as conceded. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/19/2019. (lctnm2) Modified on 8/19/2019 to edit signature date (hmc). (Entered: 08/19/2019)
2019-08-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/23/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 08/20/2019)
2019-10-0422MOTION for Extension of Time to by ANGEL PICHARDO-MARTINEZ. "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/4/19. "Seal Request DENIED" by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/4/19. (ztth) (Entered: 10/04/2019)
2019-10-07MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 22 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's 20 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before October 23, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/7/2019, nunc pro tunc to 9/23/2019. (lctnm2) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/23/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-1823RESPONSE re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) filed by ANGEL PICHARDO-MARTINEZ. "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/18/19. (ztth) (Entered: 10/23/2019)
2019-10-3024REPLY to opposition to motion re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) filed by UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 10/30/2019)
2019-12-0425RESPONSE re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) filed by ANGEL PICHARDO-MARTINEZ. "Leave to file GRANTED" by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/4/19. (ztth) (Entered: 12/06/2019)
2020-01-2726MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying without prejudice Defendant's 20 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment. See attached Memorandum and Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/27/2020. (lctnm2) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-01-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Second Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/27/2020. Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross-Motion due by 3/26/2020. Defendant's Opposition and Reply due by 4/16/2020. Plaintiff's Reply due by 5/7/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 01/27/2020)
2020-02-2027MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Second Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-02-21MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 27 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its Second Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment on or before March 5, 2020. Plaintiff shall file his Opposition and any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on or before April 2, 2020. Defendant shall file its combined Opposition and Reply on or before April 23, 2020. Plaintiff shall file his Reply, if any, on or before May 14, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/21/2020. (lctnm2) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-02-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary judgment motion due by 3/5/2020; cross-motion and opposition to motion for summary judgment due by 4/2/2020; opposition to cross-motion and reply to opposition to motion for summary judgment due by 4/23/2020; reply to opposition to cross-motion due by 5/14/2020. (tg) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar