Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02784
Date Filed2019-09-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute filed a petition with OMB asking it to update government-wide FOIA fee guidance in light of subsequent statutory and judicial changes in interpretation. OMB refused to grant COA Institute's petition. COA Institute then filed suit, alleging a violation of the Administrative Procedure Act. This action is not brought directly under FOIA but clearly deals with core FOIA concerns.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Jurisdiction - Standing

DefendantWHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 Motion for Summary Judgment
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-09-171COMPLAINT against WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6382558) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons OMB, # 6 Summons USAG, # 7 Summons USAO-DC Civil Process Clerk)(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-172LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-173NOTICE of Appearance by Russel James Valvo, III on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 09/17/2019)
2019-09-184NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-09-19Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zeg) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-195SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/19/2019)
2019-09-246RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/23/2019. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2019-09-247GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 24, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2019-09-248RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/23/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/22/2019. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2019-09-279ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 9/27/2019 (Mulvey, Ryan) Modified on 10/1/2019 (zjf). (Entered: 09/27/2019)
2019-10-01NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 9 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant was entered in error at the request of counsel (jf) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-0310RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 10/2/2019 (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-3111NOTICE of Change of Address by Lee A. Steven (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 10/31/2019)
2019-11-2212ANSWER to Complaint by WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET.(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 11/22/2019)
2019-11-25MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule governing the filing of dispositive motions on or before December 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 25, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-11-25Set/Reset Deadlines: joint proposed briefing schedule governing the filing of dispositive motions due by 12/16/2019. (hs) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-12-1613PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 12/16/2019)
2019-12-1714ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before December 30, 2019, the defendant shall file the administrative record. It is further ORDERED that, on or before January 31, 2020, the plaintiff shall file its motion for summary judgment. It is further ORDERED that, on or before February 28, 2020, the defendant shall file its combined cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. It is further ORDERED that, on or before March 13, 2020, the plaintiff shall file its combined reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and opposition to the defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment. It is further ORDERED that, on or before March 27, 2020, the defendant shall file its reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference on July 8, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 17, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2019-12-20Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Administrative Record due by 12/30/2019. Cross Motions due by 2/28/2020. Response to Cross Motions due by 3/13/2020. Reply in Support of its Cross Motion due by 3/27/2020. Summary Judgment motions due by 1/31/2020. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/28/2020. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/13/2020. Status Conference set for 7/8/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
2019-12-3015ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (certified list of contents) by WHITE HOUSE OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 12/30/2019)
2020-01-3116MOTION for Summary Judgment by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar