Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSynopsys, Inc. v. U.S. Department of Labor
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number4:2020cv00693
Date Filed2020-01-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Laurel Beeler
PlaintiffSynopsys, Inc.
Case DescriptionSynopsis, Inc. filed suit against the Department of Labor to block it from disclosing EEO-1 reports that had been ordered disclosed in December 2019 in response to a FOIA request from the Center for Investigative Reporting, arguing that the reports contained sensitive commercial information.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Reverse-FOIA - Confidential business information

DefendantU.S. Department of Labor
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-301COMPLAINT (Administrative Procedure Act Case) against Defendant U.S. Department of Labor, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14125279). Filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 1/30/2020) Modified on 1/31/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/30/2020)
2020-01-302Proposed Summons. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 1/30/2020) (Entered: 01/30/2020)
2020-01-303Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 1/30/2020) (Entered: 01/30/2020)
2020-01-304MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice by Robert M. Loeb, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14125514) filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 1/30/2020) (Entered: 01/30/2020)
2020-01-305MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice by James A. Flynn, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14125542) filed by Synopsys, Inc.. (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 1/30/2020) (Entered: 01/30/2020)
2020-01-306Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/13/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2020) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-01-31Electronic filing error . Case has been randomly assigned to judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet CAND 44 (Rev. 06/17) used at case opening. Please complete correct Civil Cov er Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19) and file as a separate docket entry: Re: 1 . 1 Complaint filed by Synopsys, Inc. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2020) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-01-317Civil Cover Sheet by Synopsys, Inc. . (Mingrone, Denise) (Filed on 1/31/2020) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-01-318Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2020) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-01-319Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (tvnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2020) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-01-3110Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/23/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2020) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-01-3111Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Labor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2020) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar