Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHawkinson v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
DistrictDistrict of Massachusetts
CityBoston
Case Number1:2020cv10189
Date Filed2020-01-31
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV
PlaintiffPro Se Party John A. Hawkinson
Case DescriptionJohn Hawkinson, a freelance reporter, submitted FOIA requests to the Executive Office for Immigration Review and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning communications between EOIR and ICE pertaining to the Pereira Brito litigation. Hawkinson also requested a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the request and both agencies told Hawkinson that his request was complex and would take further time to process. After hearing nothing further from either agency, Hawkinson filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantImmigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantExecutive Office for Immigration Review
DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
DefendantDepartment of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-01-311COMPLAINT For Injunctive Relief against All Defendants, filed by John A. Hawkinson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Cover Letter, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Category Form)(Kelly, Danielle). (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-01-312MOTION for Leave to file electronically Pro Se by John A. Hawkinson.(Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-01-313MOTION to Set 30-Day Time For Answer Pursuant To Freedom of Information Act, 5 USC S552(a)(4)(C) by John A. Hawkinson. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-01-314Filing fee/payment: $ 400.00, receipt number 1BST078479 for 1 Complaint, (Currie, Haley) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-01-315ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-01-316Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 01/31/2020)
2020-02-037Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 2 Motion for leave to electronically file Pro Se. The court grants permission on the condition that the plaintiff satisfies all applicable training and other requirements for pro se litigants as stated in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, Page 5. The plaintiff is directed to complete the registration form accessible at https://public.mad.uscourts.gov/ecfreg.html (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 02/03/2020)
2020-02-038Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: "The motion is DENIED without prejudice. The motion requests an order directing respondents to follow the requirements of a federal statute. No court involvement is required unless the statutory requirement is not followed." ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying 3 Motion without prejudice. (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 02/03/2020)
2020-02-049SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by John A. Hawkinson. Department of Homeland Security served on 1/31/2020, answer due 3/2/2020; Department of Justice served on 1/31/2020, answer due 3/2/2020; Executive Office for Immigration Review served on 1/31/2020, answer due 3/2/2020; Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 1/31/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Hawkinson, John) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-0410SUMMONS Returned Executed by John A. Hawkinson. (Hawkinson, John) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-0511SUMMONS Returned Executed by John A. Hawkinson. All Defendants., SUMMONS Returned Executed by John A. Hawkinson. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certified receipt for ATTORNEY GENERAL (all defendants, pursuant to FRCP4(i)(1)(B)))(Hawkinson, John) (Entered: 02/05/2020)
2020-02-0512SUMMONS Returned Executed by John A. Hawkinson. Department of Justice served on 2/5/2020, answer due 3/6/2020., SUMMONS Returned Executed by John A. Hawkinson. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certified receipt for DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE)(Hawkinson, John) (Entered: 02/05/2020)
2020-02-0613SUMMONS Returned Executed by John A. Hawkinson. Department of Homeland Security served on 2/6/2020, answer due 3/9/2020; Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 2/6/2020, answer due 3/9/2020., SUMMONS Returned Executed by John A. Hawkinson. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certified receipt for IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, # 2 Certified receipt for DEPT. OF HOMELAND SECURITY)(Hawkinson, John) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-1014NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Sady on behalf of Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Sady, Michael) (Entered: 02/10/2020)
2020-03-0615MOTION for Extension of Time to April 6, 2020 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Sady, Michael) (Entered: 03/06/2020)
2020-03-0616RESPONSE to Motion re 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to April 6, 2020 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond : non-opposition with request for scheduling conference filed by John A. Hawkinson. (Hawkinson, John) (Entered: 03/06/2020)
2020-04-0617MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/20/20 to File Response/Reply by Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Sady, Michael) (Entered: 04/06/2020)
2020-04-0618RESPONSE to Motion re 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/20/20 to File Response/Reply indicating assent filed by John A. Hawkinson. (Hawkinson, John) (Entered: 04/06/2020)
2020-04-0719Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Answers due 4/20/2020. (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 04/07/2020)
2020-04-2020ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Sady, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2020)
2020-04-2221ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2020 03:10 PM in Courtroom 10 before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Attachments: # 1 Scheduling Order Template). This hearing may be held by telephone; the clerk shall be in contact with parties prior to determine same. The clerk shall post updated hearing information on the docket when it becomes available. (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 04/22/2020)
2020-05-1122Joint CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Sady, Michael) (Entered: 05/11/2020)
2020-05-1123AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by John A. Hawkinson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: FOIA.gov acknowledgment of EOIR request, # 2 Exhibit B: Letter acknowledgment of EOIR request, # 3 Exhibit C: Email acknowledgment of ICE request, # 4 Exhibit D: ICE FOIA contact webpage, # 5 Exhibit E: DHS FOIA status check webpage result, # 6 Exhibit F: DHS FOIA contact webpage, # 7 Exhibit G: DHS FOIA Public Liaison Bennett email correspondence, # 8 Exhibit HH: Dec. 16 declaration of ACIJ Jose A. Sanchez, # 9 Exhibit II: Jan. 22 email to ICE FOIA seeking status, # 10 Exhibit JJ: March 2 ICE FOIA email reply, # 11 Exhibit KK: Jan. 23, 24 emails to ICE FOIA seeking telephone number, # 12 Exhibit LL: DHS FY19 Annual FOIA Report, # 13 Exhibit MM: DHS FOIA status check webpages of Feb. 4, March 1, and April 17, # 14 Exhibit NN: ICE FOIA production of April 22, # 15 Exhibit OO: Cover letter for ICE Production)(Hawkinson, John) (Entered: 05/11/2020)
2020-05-1124NOTICE by John A. Hawkinson re 23 Amended Complaint,,, Plaintiff's notice of first amended complaint (Attachments: # 1 Redline of First Amended Complaint)(Hawkinson, John) (Entered: 05/11/2020)
2020-05-1225Supplemental CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 pro-se Plaintiff's 16.1(d)(3) "certification" . (Hawkinson, John) (Entered: 05/12/2020)
2020-05-1326NOTICE re: Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2020 03:10 PM before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. This hearing shall be conducted remotely, by telephone only. Counsel of record will receive dial-in instructions at the email registered in CM/ECF. (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 05/13/2020)
2020-05-1927Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Scheduling Conference held on 5/19/2020. Case called; hearing is conducted by telephone. Parties update court as to status of document production and anticipated trajectory of case. Court sets further status conference. NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephone Status Conference set for 6/5/2020 at 11:00 AM before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. This hearing shall be conducted remotely, by telephone only. Counsel of record will receive dial-in instructions at the email registered in CM/ECF. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.) (Attorneys present: Hawkinson, Sady) (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 05/19/2020)
2020-05-2628ANSWER to 23 Amended Complaint,,, by Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Sady, Michael) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
2020-06-0129Transcript of Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on May 19, 2020, before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com Redaction Request due 6/22/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/2/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/31/2020. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-0130NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-0531Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held on 6/5/2020. Case called; hearing is conducted by telephone. Court discussed with parties anticipated scheduling of production, and set further status conference. NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephone Conference set for 6/30/2020 03:30 PM before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.) (Attorneys present: Hawkinson, Sady) (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 06/05/2020)
2020-06-1132Transcript of Telephonic Status Conference held on June 5, 2020, before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com Redaction Request due 7/2/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/9/2020. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-1133NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-2634ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING: Telephone Status Conference reset for 7/1/2020 at 3:20 PM before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. This hearing shall be conducted remotely, by telephone only. Counsel of record will receive dial-in instructions at the email registered in CM/ECF. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public by way of teleconference. In order to gain access to the hearing via teleconference you must sign up at the following address: www.public.mad.uscourts.gov/seating-signup. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact www.media@uscourts.gov. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violations of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or denial of entry to future hearings, and such other sanctions, including for contempt of court, as may be deemed appropriate or necessary by the court. (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-2935STATUS REPORT for June 5-29 by John A. Hawkinson. (Hawkinson, John) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-07-0136Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held on 7/1/2020. Case called; hearing is conducted by telephone. Court is updated as to status of document production. Court sets further status conference. NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephone Status Conference set for 8/5/2020 at 3:20 PM before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. This hearing shall be conducted remotely, by telephone only. Counsel of record will receive dial-in instructions at the email registered in CM/ECF. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public by way of teleconference. In order to gain access to the hearing via teleconference you must sign up at the following address: https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact www.media@uscourts.gov. P ersons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violations of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or denial of entry to future hearings, and such other sanctions, including for contempt of court, as may be deemed appropriate or necessary by the court. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Hawkinson, Sady) (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 07/01/2020)
2020-08-0537Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Status Conference held on 8/5/2020. Case called; hearing is conducted by telephone. Court is updated as to status of document production. Court sets dispositive motion timetable and hearing date: Dispositive Motions/Vaughn Index Deadline: 45 days after completion of document production; no later than 10/15/2020; Responses due: 11/5/2020; Replies due: 11/12/2020. Motion hearing set for 11/13/2020 at 2:00 PM. (Separate motion hearing notice shall enter.) (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.) (Attorneys present: Hawkinson, Sady) (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 08/06/2020)
2020-08-0638ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Dispositive Motion(s): Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2020 at 2:00 PM before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html . For questions regarding acc ess to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 08/06/2020)
2020-08-0639Transcript of Telephonic Status Conference held on July 1, 2020, before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com. Redaction Request due 8/27/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/8/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/4/2020. (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-08-0640NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Belpedio, Lisa) (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-09-0441STATUS REPORT -- FOIA production is complete -- by John A. Hawkinson. (Hawkinson, John) (Entered: 09/04/2020)
2020-09-0942STATUS REPORT -- FOIA production is -- again -- complete -- by John A. Hawkinson. (Hawkinson, John) (Entered: 09/09/2020)
2020-10-0943Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/5/20 to File Summary Judgment by Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Sady, Michael) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
2020-10-1344Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time to File to 11/5/20 to File Summary Judgment by Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-10-1945ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Dispositive Motion(s): Motion Hearing reset for 12/11/2020 at 10:00 AM in Remote Proceeding: Boston before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. Amended Motion Deadlines: Dispositive motion shall be filed by 11/5/2020; opposition shall be filed by 11/27/2020; reply due 12/4/2020. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
2020-11-0546Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Excess of 20 Pages by Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Sady, Michael) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-0547MOTION for Summary Judgment by Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Sady, Michael) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-0548MEMORANDUM in Support re 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Sady, Michael) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-0549Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Sady, Michael) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-0650MOTION to Strike 49 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1, -- to strike in part -- by John A. Hawkinson.(Hawkinson, John) (Entered: 11/06/2020)
2020-11-0651Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 46 Motion for Leave to File Document. (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 11/06/2020)
2020-11-2052Opposition re 50 MOTION to Strike 49 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1, -- to strike in part -- filed by Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Sady, Michael) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
2020-11-2353MOTION for Leave to File reply in support of his 50 motion to strike, in part, 49 Defendants' Statement of Material Facts by John A. Hawkinson. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's PROPOSED reply in support of his 50 motion to strike, in part, 49 Defendants' Statement of Material Facts)(Hawkinson, John) (Entered: 11/23/2020)
2020-11-2454Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 53 Motion for Leave to File Document. (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-2755MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/30/2020 to File Response/Reply as to 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment by John A. Hawkinson.(Hawkinson, John) (Entered: 11/27/2020)
2020-11-3056Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 55 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-11-3057MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John A. Hawkinson. (Hawkinson, John) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-11-3058Counter Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment and response to defendants' SOMF filed by John A. Hawkinson. (Hawkinson, John) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-12-0159Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/11/20 to File Reply and Continue Hearing by Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Sady, Michael) (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2020-12-0260Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 59 Motion for Extension of Time. (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 12/02/2020)
2020-12-0261ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing reset for 12/17/2020 at 9:30 AM in Remote Proceeding: Boston before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 12/02/2020)
2020-12-0462ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing reset for 12/16/2020 at 2:00 PM in Remote Proceeding: Boston before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 12/04/2020)
2020-12-1163REPLY to Response to 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Sady, Michael) (Entered: 12/11/2020)
2020-12-1164Response by Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Immigration and Customs Enforcement to 58 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 . (Sady, Michael) (Entered: 12/11/2020)
2020-12-1665Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV: Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2020 re 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Executive Office for Immigration Review, Department of Justice. Case called; hearing is conducted by video conference. Court hears argument from parties and takes matter under advisement. (Court Reporter: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com.) (Attorneys present: Hawkinson, Sady) (Bono, Christine) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
2021-01-1366NOTICE by John A. Hawkinson of Facts at Odds with Defendant ICE's Affidavit (Hawkinson, John) (Entered: 01/13/2021)
2021-01-1367AFFIDAVIT in Support re 66 Notice (Other) Affidavit in Support of Notice of Facts at Odds with Defendant ICE's Affidavit . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: {Jan. 6, 2021 ICE emails re 2021-ICFO-18651, # 2 Exhibit B: Jan. 7, 2021 ICE emails re 2020-ICFO-89315, # 3 Exhibit C: Jan. 12, 2021 ICE email re 2021-ICFO-18651)(Hawkinson, John) (Entered: 01/13/2021)
2021-02-1168Transcript of Motion Hearing held on December 16, 2020, before Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor IV. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com. Redaction Request due 3/4/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/15/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/12/2021. (Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 02/16/2021)
2021-02-1169NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 02/16/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar