Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00287
Date Filed2020-02-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffBUZZFEED, INC.
Case DescriptionReporter Jason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to the Office of the Inspector General at the Department of Justice for records concerning the preparation of the December 2019 report on the four FISA applications for the Crossfire Hurricane investigation. Leopold also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied Leopold's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-031COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6790124) filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 02/03/2020)
2020-02-032NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 02/03/2020)
2020-02-033LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 02/03/2020)
2020-02-04Case assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zmc) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-044SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-105STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 10, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 02/10/2020)
2020-03-166ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-19MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this Freedom of Information Act case are a Complaint and an Answer. According to Local Civil Rule 16.3, the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) are inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before April 15, 2020. The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of Plaintiffs' FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiffs' FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiffs; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); (5) the possibility of prioritizing documents responsive to Plaintiffs' request[s] and any discussions regarding whether Plaintiffs' request[s] can be narrowed; and (6) whether the Parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 19, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 03/19/2020)
2020-03-19Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 4/15/2020. (zcdw) (Entered: 03/22/2020)
2020-03-257RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/14/2020 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/25/2020)
2020-03-258RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/14/2020. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/25/2020)
2020-03-259RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/14/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/15/2020. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/25/2020)
2020-04-1510Joint STATUS REPORT on Behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/15/2020)
2020-06-0311Joint STATUS REPORT on Behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/03/2020)
2020-06-15MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 10 and 11 Joint Status Reports, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report on or before July 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 15, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 06/15/2020)
2020-06-15Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 7/10/2020 (zcdw) (Entered: 06/16/2020)
2020-07-1012Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
2020-07-20MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 12 Joint Status Reports, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report on or before September 4, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 20, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/4/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-09-0413Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/04/2020)
2020-09-10MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report on or before October 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 10, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 09/10/2020)
2020-09-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/15/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 09/10/2020)
2020-10-1514Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-20MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit an additional Joint Status Report by December 3, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 20, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-10-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/3/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 10/20/2020)
2020-12-0315Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
2020-12-08MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that they shall submit another Joint Status Report by January 29, 2021 . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 8, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 12/08/2020)
2020-12-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/29/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 12/08/2020)
2021-01-2916Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
2021-02-04MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of the Parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file another Joint Status Report by March 19, 2021 . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 4, 2021. (lccjn3) Modified on 2/4/2021 (zcal). (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/19/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-03-1917Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/19/2021)
2021-04-12MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 17 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties submit another Joint Status Report by May 21, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 12, 2021. (lccjn3) (Entered: 04/12/2021)
2021-04-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/21/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 04/12/2021)
2021-05-2118Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/21/2021)
2021-06-21MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 18 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties submit another Joint Status Report by July 21, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 21, 2021. (lccjn3) (Entered: 06/21/2021)
2021-06-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/21/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 06/22/2021)
2021-07-2119Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/21/2021)
2021-08-10MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 19 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file another Joint Status Report by September 21, 2021 , and every 30 days thereafter until this matter is resolved. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on August 10, 2021. (lccjn3) (Entered: 08/10/2021)
2021-08-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/21/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 08/10/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar