Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSAE PRODUCTIONS, INC. v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00297
Date Filed2020-02-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffSAE PRODUCTIONS, INC.
Case DescriptionSteven Emerson, on behalf of SAE Productions, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning the agency's investigative files related to the Holy Land Foundation for Relief and Development. The FBI acknowledged the request and told SAE Productions that it would be charged duplication fees. The agency then told SAE Productions that it had located nearly 1.3 million responsive pages and told SAE Productions that duplication fees would be $39,415 to provide the records on CDs. SAE Productions filed an administrative appeal of the denial of its fee waiver request. The Office of Information Policy remanded the fee waiver issue back to the FBI. The FBI upheld its original cost estimate and SAE Productions agreed to pay a $500 down payment. SAE Productions then agreed to narrow its request to a total of 593 pages. After hearing nothing further from the agency, SAE Productions filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Fees, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-041COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6795131) filed by SAE PRODUCTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L)(London, Ronald) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-042LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SAE PRODUCTIONS, INC. (London, Ronald) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-05Case assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zmc) (Entered: 02/05/2020)
2020-02-053SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 02/05/2020)
2020-02-054ENTERED IN ERROR.....REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE TO US ATTORNEY GENERAL WILLIAM BARR re 1 Complaint, filed by SAE PRODUCTIONS, INC. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by SAE PRODUCTIONS, INC. (London, Ronald) Modified on 2/6/2020 (jf). (Entered: 02/05/2020)
2020-02-055ENTERED IN ERROR.....REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE TO US ATTORNEY FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA JESSIE LIU re 1 Complaint, filed by SAE PRODUCTIONS, INC.. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by SAE PRODUCTIONS, INC..(London, Ronald) Modified on 2/6/2020 (jf). (Entered: 02/05/2020)
2020-02-06NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 5 Request for Summons to Issue, 4 Request for Summons to Issue, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading with the corrected form (jf) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-066REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, Notice of Corrected Docket Entry filed by SAE PRODUCTIONS, INC.. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by SAE PRODUCTIONS, INC., Notice of Corrected Docket Entry.(London, Ronald) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-067SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-108MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mark R. Caramanica, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6816322. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SAE PRODUCTIONS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(London, Ronald) (Entered: 02/10/2020)
2020-02-119RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/7/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/8/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service FBI, # 2 Certificate of Service Liu)(London, Ronald) (Entered: 02/11/2020)
2020-02-1110GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/11/2020. (jag) (Entered: 02/11/2020)
2020-02-11MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Mark R. Caramanica is admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiff. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/11/2020. (jag) (Entered: 02/11/2020)
2020-02-1111RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 2/7/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/07/2020. (See Docket Entry 9 to view document) (jf) (Entered: 02/12/2020)
2020-02-12NOTICE OF ERROR re 9 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to ronnielondon@dwt.com, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. FYI DO NOT REFILE - Counsel is reminded to docket all parts of their filing(s) (zjf, ) (Entered: 02/12/2020)
2020-02-1312NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R. Caramanica on behalf of SAE PRODUCTIONS, INC. (Caramanica, Mark) (Entered: 02/13/2020)
2020-03-0913ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-09MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall review this Court's 10 General Order and Guidelines Applicable to FOIA Cases, and promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for disclosure or briefing motions for summary judgment, on or before 3/23/2020. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 3/9/2020. (jag) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-2314Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael G. Seidel)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/23/2020)
2020-03-2315NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy S. Simon on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/23/2020)
2020-03-26MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 4/23/2020, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 3/26/2020. (jag) (Entered: 03/26/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar