Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEvans v. University of California Davis
DistrictSouthern District of Georgia
CitySavannah
Case Number4:2020cv00025
Date Filed2020-02-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge R. Stan Baker
PlaintiffOren G. Evans
Case DescriptionOren Evans filed suit against the University of California-Davis to force the university to disclose an autism study, which Evans contended should be disclosed under FOIA because it was funded by an NIH grant. The University of California-Davis is not subject to the federal FOIA so this is not a FOIA claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantUniversity of California Davis
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-041COMPLAINT against University of California Davis, filed by Oren G. Evans. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jrb) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-042MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Oren G. Evans. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(jrb) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-043Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. CLICK HERE TO READ . (jrb) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-044RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 2/4/20. (jrb) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-055REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of U.S. Magistrate Judge recommending denying re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Oren G. Evans. Objections to R&R due by 2/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 02/05/2020. (JH) (Entered: 02/05/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar