Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFriends of the Boundary Waters Wilderness v. Bureau of Land Management et al
DistrictDistrict of Minnesota
CityDMN
Case Number0:2020cv00438
Date Filed2020-02-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeSenior Judge Paul A. Magnuson
PlaintiffFriends of the Boundary Waters Wilderness
Case DescriptionThe Friends of the Boundary Waters Wilderness submitted two FOIA requests to the Bureau of Land Management for records concerning pending and withdrawn hardrock mineral applications in the Superior National Forest identified in BLM's 2019 Environmental Assessment, including communications about pending or withdrawn applications from Twin Metals Minnesota. The agency acknowledged receipt of the first request. The second request asked for records concerning lease renewals of two identified existing mine leases. The agency did not acknowledge the second FOIA request. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to either request, Friends of the Boundary Waters Wilderness filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBureau of Land Management
DefendantUnited States of America
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-041COMPLAINT against Bureau of Land Management, United States of America (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7453299) filed by Friends of the Boundary Waters Wilderness. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2 to Complaint, # 3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3 to Complaint, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lukoff, Ari) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-042RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Friends of the Boundary Waters Wilderness. (Lukoff, Ari) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-043TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 20-cv-438 PAM/LIB. (kt) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-044Summons Issued as to Bureau of Land Management, United States of America. (kt) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-065SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Friends of the Boundary Waters Wilderness. Bureau of Land Management served on 2/5/2020, answer due 4/6/2020; United States of America served on 2/5/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (Lukoff, Ari) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-106NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Tweeten on behalf of Bureau of Land Management, United States of America. (Tweeten, Andrew) (Entered: 02/10/2020)
2020-03-097ANSWER to Complaint filed by Bureau of Land Management, United States of America. (Tweeten, Andrew) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-118ORDER in re dispositive motion practice in cases assigned to The Hon. Paul A. Maguson. 3/10/2020. (LLM) Modified signature date on 3/11/2020 (lmb). (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-259PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/25/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(JLB) (Entered: 03/25/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar