Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBrennan Center for Justice at the New York University School of Law et al v. United States Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2020cv00947
Date Filed2020-02-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Vernon S. Broderick
PlaintiffBrennan Center for Justice at the New York University School of Law
PlaintiffDefending Rights & Dissent
Case DescriptionThe Brennan Center for Justice submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning the agency's Foreign Influence Task Force. The Brennan Center also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After the agency failed to respond within the statutory time limits, the Brennan Center filed an administrative appeal. The Office of Information Policy told the Brennan Center that its request for expedited processing was denied. OIP also told the Brennan Center that since the FBI had not yet made an adverse determination there was nothing to review. The Brennan Center then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Federal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-041COMPLAINT against United States Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18686163)Document filed by Brennan Center for Justice at the New York University School of Law, Defending Rights & Dissent. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FITF Request).(Nolan, Francis) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-042CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nolan, Francis) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-043REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Brennan Center for Justice at the New York University School of Law, Defending Rights & Dissent..(Nolan, Francis) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-044RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Brennan Center for Justice at the New York University School of Law..(Nolan, Francis) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-045RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Defending Rights & Dissent..(Nolan, Francis) (Entered: 02/04/2020)
2020-02-05CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(pne) (Entered: 02/05/2020)
2020-02-05Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (pne) (Entered: 02/05/2020)
2020-02-05Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 02/05/2020)
2020-02-056ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Federal Bureau of Investigation..(pne) (Entered: 02/05/2020)
2020-02-077SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE) Summons and Complaint, served. United States Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 2/6/2020, answer due 3/9/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Brennan Center for Justice at the New York University School of Law; Defending Rights & Dissent..(Nolan, Francis) (Entered: 02/07/2020)
2020-03-098SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE) Summons and Complaint, served. United States Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/25/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Brennan Center for Justice at the New York University School of Law; Defending Rights & Dissent..(Nolan, Francis) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-099NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony Jan-Huan Sun on behalf of United States Federal Bureau of Investigation..(Sun, Anthony) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-0910ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States Federal Bureau of Investigation..(Sun, Anthony) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar