Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCOLEMAN v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00305
Date Filed2020-02-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffJESSE COLEMAN
Case DescriptionJesse Coleman, a researcher with Documented, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the calendar and resume for Melissa Simpson, the current Deputy Assistant Secretary for Energy Transformation. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Coleman contacted the agency several times to check on the status of his request without success. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Coleman filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-051COMPLAINT against JESSE COLEMAN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6798635) filed by JESSE COLEMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons Department of State, # 4 Summons US Atty DC)(Joshi, Nandan) (Entered: 02/05/2020)
2020-02-06Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zsb) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-062SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-063NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick D. Llewellyn on behalf of JESSE COLEMAN (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-064RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/6/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/7/2020. (Joshi, Nandan) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-145STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 02/14/20. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 02/14/2020)
2020-02-286ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Jackson, Michelle) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-03-02MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than April 1, 2020. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) The anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (4) Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/2/2020. (lcegs2) (Entered: 03/02/2020)
2020-03-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Scheduling Order due by 4/1/2020. (mac) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-057ENTERRED IN ERROR.....STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 03/05/20. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-05NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 7 Order was entered in error. (mac) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-04-018Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, Michelle) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
2020-04-01MINUTE ORDER. In view of 8 joint status report, the parties are directed to file a joint proposed scheduling order by no later than June 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/1/2020. (lcegs2) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
2020-04-019MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (See Docket Enry 8 to view document) (jf) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
2020-04-01NOTICE OF ERROR re 8 Status Report; emailed to michelle.d.jackson@usdoj.gov, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry, 2. DO NOT REFILE- COUNSEL IS REMINDED TO DOCKET ALL PARTS OF THEIR PLEADING (zjf, ) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
2020-04-01NOTICE OF ERROR re 8 Status Report; emailed to michelle.d.jackson@usdoj.gov, cc'd 4 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. Counsel needs to add their email address via Pacer (zjf, ) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar