Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHOPPOCK v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00316
Date Filed2020-02-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffMATTHEW L. HOPPOCK
Case DescriptionMatthew Hoppock, an immigration attorney, submitted three FOIA requests to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning the agency's policy on denaturalization. Hoppock also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver for his second and third requests. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency denied Hoppock's requests for expedited processing for his second and third requests. Hoppock filed administrative appeals of the denials of expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Hoppock filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-051COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6800406) filed by Matthew Hoppock. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 02/05/2020)
2020-02-052MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Amber Qureshi, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6800615. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Matthew Hoppock (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Amber Qureshi, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 02/05/2020)
2020-02-06Case assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zmc) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-06SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (zmc) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-063REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by MATTHEW L. HOPPOCK. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by MATTHEW L. HOPPOCK.(Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-064SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (jf) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-185CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MATTHEW L. HOPPOCK re 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Amber Qureshi, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6800615. Fee Status: Fee Paid. . (Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 02/18/2020)
2020-02-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 2/14/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/18/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/19/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/18/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Shebaya, Sirine) (Entered: 02/18/2020)
2020-03-037ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for in structions . Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 03/03/2020. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-108NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Qureshi on behalf of MATTHEW L. HOPPOCK (Qureshi, Amber) (Entered: 03/10/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar