Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc. v. US Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictSouthern District of Texas
CityHouston
Case Number4:2020cv00397
Date Filed2020-02-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Andrew S Hanen
PlaintiffACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe ACLU of Texas submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the administrative and criminal warrants served on CVE Technology Group when searching for undocumented workers. The ACLU of Texas also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request on the basis of Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). The ACLU of Texas filed an administrative appeal of the denial. The agency upheld the denial on appeal. The ACLU of Texas then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUS Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUS Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-051COMPLAINT against US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0541-24110725) filed by ACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Donatti, David) Payment information added on 2/5/2020 (ltien, 4). (Entered: 02/05/2020)
2020-02-062ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/2/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-103NOTICE of Appearance by Andre Ivan Segura on behalf of ACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc., filed. (Donatti, David) (Entered: 02/10/2020)
2020-02-104NOTICE of Appearance by Edgar Saldivar on behalf of ACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc., filed. (Donatti, David) (Entered: 02/10/2020)
2020-02-195CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc., filed.(Donatti, David) (Entered: 02/19/2020)
2020-02-196Request for Issuance of Summons as to US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted attachment Summons, # 2 Unredacted attachment Summons, # 3 Unredacted attachment Summons)(Donatti, David) (Entered: 02/19/2020)
2020-02-217Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Summon, # 2 Summon, # 3 Summon)(hlerma, 4) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-03-118RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to US Department of Homeland Security served on 3/2/2020, answer due 5/1/2020; US Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 3/2/2020, answer due 5/1/2020, filed.(Donatti, David) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-279NOTICE Regarding Defendants' Answer Deadline by ACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc., filed. (Donatti, David) (Entered: 03/27/2020)
2020-03-3010Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/20/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rodriguez, Jimmy) (Entered: 03/30/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar