Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00322
Date Filed2020-02-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of State for records concerning Vice President Pence's travel to Poland and Ireland, during which time he met with Ukrainian President Zelensky. American Oversight's third request asked for communications between the State Department and the Office of the Vice President pertaining to the trip. American Oversight also requested expedited processing for all three requests. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and granted the requests for expedited processing for all three requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of the three requests, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-061COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6803184) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-062LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-06Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-063SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-284RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/6/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/7/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/11/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 2/11/2020 (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-03-095ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Sandberg, Justin) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-09MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule by March 24, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/9/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-176NOTICE of Appearance by Indraneel Sur on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Sur, Indraneel) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-03-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 3/24/2020 (tj) (Entered: 03/20/2020)
2020-03-237NOTICE of Appearance by Hart W. Wood on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Wood, Hart) (Main Document 7 replaced on 3/24/2020) (ztth). (Entered: 03/23/2020)
2020-03-248Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Sur, Indraneel) (Entered: 03/24/2020)
2020-03-24MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before April 24, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/24/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/24/2020)
2020-03-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/24/2020 (tj) (Entered: 03/25/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar