Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCapital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityBaltimore
Case Number1:2020cv00327
Date Filed2020-02-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman
PlaintiffCapital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition
Case DescriptionThe Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement concerning custody decisions in the ICE Maryland Area of Responsibility under the Immigration Nationality Act. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency subsequently asked for clarification. CAIR responded to the clarification request. CAIR then filed an administrative appeal because the agency had failed to respond to its request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CAIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantMatthew T. Albence
DefendantMatthew T. Albence Acting Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantChad F. Wolf Acting Secretary of the U.S. Department of Homeland Security
DefendantCHAD F. WOLF
DefendantGreg L. Collett Acting Director of the Maryland Field Office of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantGreg L. Collett
DefendantRobert K. Hur
DefendantWilliam Barr, .
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-071COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8501396.), filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons)(Doss, April) (Entered: 02/07/2020)
2020-02-102QC NOTICE: 1 Complaint, filed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Summonses (Individual summons for each named defendant, as well as, summons for the US Attorney and Attorney General. Total of 7) To correct this problem, file Proposed Summonses using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summonses to 1 Complaint. (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/10/2020)
2020-02-103NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman. Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition or counsel for Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded here . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded here , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 2/24/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/10/2020)
2020-02-104Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 2/10/2020. (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/10/2020)
2020-02-115NOTICE by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition re 1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Doss, April) (Entered: 02/11/2020)
2020-02-116Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition (Doss, April) (Entered: 02/11/2020)
2020-02-127Summons Issued 60 days as to Matthew T. Albence, Greg L. Collett, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad F. Wolf, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/12/2020)
2020-02-259SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition. Greg L. Collett served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020.(Doss, April) (Entered: 02/25/2020)
2020-02-2510SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition. Robert K. Hur served on 2/24/2020, answer due 3/16/2020.(Doss, April) (Entered: 02/25/2020)
2020-03-1111SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition. United States Department of Homeland Security served on 3/3/2020, answer due 5/4/2020.(Doss, April) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-1112SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 3/3/2020, answer due 5/4/2020.(Doss, April) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-1113SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition. Matthew T. Albence served on 3/3/2020, answer due 5/4/2020.(Doss, April) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-1114SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition. William Barr served on 3/3/2020, answer due 5/4/2020.(Doss, April) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-1115SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition. Chad F. Wolf served on 3/3/2020, answer due 5/4/2020.(Doss, April) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-1116NOTICE of Appearance by Jillian Kelsey Walton on behalf of Capital Area Immigrants' Rights Coalition (Walton, Jillian) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar