Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEDDINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00442
Date Filed2020-02-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffPATRICK EDDINGTON
Case DescriptionPatrick Eddington, a policy analyst at the Cato Institute, submitted FOIA requests to 14 components of the Department of Defense for records concerning a DOD directive on acquiring information from individuals or organizations not affiliated with the Department of Defense. Eddington also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. After hearing nothing from any of the components pertaining to his requests, Eddington filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Opinion/Order [18]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-141COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6832428) filed by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 02/14/2020)
2020-02-142NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 02/14/2020)
2020-02-143NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 02/14/2020)
2020-02-14Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/14/2020)
2020-02-144SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/14/2020)
2020-03-255RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 2/24/2020 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 03/25/2020)
2020-03-256RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/27/2020. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 03/25/2020)
2020-03-257RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/26/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/27/2020. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 03/25/2020)
2020-03-278NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 03/27/2020)
2020-03-279Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 03/27/2020)
2020-03-30MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's deadline to answer the complaint is extended until April 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/30/2020. (lcapm2) (Entered: 03/30/2020)
2020-03-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/27/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 03/30/2020)
2020-04-2710MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/27/2020)
2020-04-2811ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its motion to dismiss on or before June 10, 2020; Plaintiff shall file his opposition on or before July 10, 2020; and Defendant shall file its reply on or before July 31, 2020. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/28/2020. (lcapm2) (Entered: 04/28/2020)
2020-04-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion to Dismiss due by 6/10/2020. Opposition due by 7/10/2020. Reply due by 7/31/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 04/29/2020)
2020-06-1012MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/10/2020)
2020-07-0713Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Briefing Schedule by PATRICK EDDINGTON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 07/07/2020)
2020-07-0814ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition shall be filed on or before August 10, 2020; Defendant's combined opposition and reply shall be filed on or before September 9, 2020; and Plaintiff's reply shall be filed on or before September 30, 2020. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/08/2020. (lcapm2) (Entered: 07/08/2020)
2020-07-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross-Motion due by 8/10/2020. Defendant's Reply and Opposition due by 9/9/2020. Plaintiff's Reply due by 9/30/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-08-1015Memorandum in opposition to re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Opposition to Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration Decl of Eddington, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-09-0916Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 09/09/2020)
2020-09-10MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Defendant's reply in support of its motion for summary judgment shall now be due on or before September 23, 2020. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/10/2020. (lcapm2) (Entered: 09/10/2020)
2020-09-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 9/23/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 09/10/2020)
2020-09-2317REPLY to opposition to motion re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2021-01-18MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall appear for a telephonic status hearing on January 21, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. The courtroom deputy will circulate dial-in information to counsel. Members of the public may access the hearing by dialing the court's toll-free public access line: (877) 848-7030, access code 321-8747. The public access line will be muted and should only be used by non-participating parties. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/18/2021. (lcapm2) (Entered: 01/18/2021)
2021-01-21Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 1/21/2021 via teleconference. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (zjd) (Entered: 01/21/2021)
2021-01-2518MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 12 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Please see the attached Memorandum Opinion for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/25/2021. (lcapm2) (Entered: 01/25/2021)
2021-01-2519ORDER: For the reasons stated in the 18 Memorandum Opinion, the court grants Defendant's 12 Motion for Summary Judgment. Please see the attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/25/2021. (lcapm2) (Entered: 01/25/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar