Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNOVATKA v. UNITED STATES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00459
Date Filed2020-02-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffMICHAEL JAMES NOVATKA
Case DescriptionMichael Novatka submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning Customs Case No. 2018-4701-005772. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told Novatka that the cost of the records would be $140. Novatka submitted a money order for $140. The agency then told Novatka that it would withhold 130 pages of the file under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding) and returned Novatka's money order. Novatka filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Novatka filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-181COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6839779) filed by MICHAEL JAMES NOVATKA.(Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 02/18/2020)
2020-02-182CIVIL COVER SHEET by MICHAEL JAMES NOVATKA filed by MICHAEL JAMES NOVATKA.(Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 02/18/2020)
2020-02-193REQUEST TO ISSUE SUMMONS by MICHAEL JAMES NOVATKA (Herrick, Peter) Modified to edit docket entry text on 2/19/2020 (zmc). (Entered: 02/19/2020)
2020-02-194REQUEST TO ISSUE SUMMONS by MICHAEL JAMES NOVATKA (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Herrick, Peter) Modified to edit docket entry text on 2/19/2020 (zmc). (Entered: 02/19/2020)
2020-02-195AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES filed by MICHAEL JAMES NOVATKA.(Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 02/19/2020)
2020-02-20Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-02-206SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-03-027RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/25/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/26/2020. (Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 03/02/2020)
2020-03-028RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General February 25, 2020. (Herrick, Peter) (Entered: 03/02/2020)
2020-03-169NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of UNITED STATES (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar