Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePATRICIA W. DAUGHERTY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00473
Date Filed2020-02-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffPATRICIA W. DAUGHERTY
Case DescriptionPatricia Daugherty submitted a FOIA request to the National Institute of Health for records concerning the grant application for grant R01HD082554-01A1 (The Impact of Early Medical Treatment and Transgender Youth), awarded by the National Institute of Child Health and Human Development. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency disclosed 198 pages but did not provide the consent forms Daugherty requested. Daugherty filed an administrative appeal. The agency acknowledged receipt of the appeal but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Daugherty filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-191COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6844359) filed by PATRICIA W. DAUGHERTY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Health and Human Services)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 02/19/2020)
2020-02-20Case assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zmc) (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-02-282SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmd) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-03-123RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/5/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/4/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/5/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 3/4/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-174NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar