Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleInformed Consent Action Network v. Centers for Disease Control and Prevention
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2020cv01453
Date Filed2020-02-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Andrew L. Carter, Jr
PlaintiffInformed Consent Action Network
Case DescriptionInformed Consent Network submitted a FOIA request to the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention for records concerning communications sent or received by Frank DiStefano, who was director of the Immunization Safety Office, from employees or representatives of GlaxoSmithKline. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency located 281 pages and withheld 81 pages in full and 30 pages in part under Exemption 5 (privileges) and Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). Informed Consent Network filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Informed Consent Network filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCenters for Disease Control and Prevention
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [8]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-191COMPLAINT against Centers for Disease Control and Prevention. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18852365)Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network..(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 02/19/2020)
2020-02-192CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 02/19/2020)
2020-02-193REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network..(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 02/19/2020)
2020-02-20CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(pc) (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-02-20Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (pc) (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-02-20Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-02-204ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Centers for Disease Control and Prevention..(pc) (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-03-175NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lucas Estlund Issacharoff on behalf of Centers for Disease Control and Prevention..(Issacharoff, Lucas) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-03-176LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Lucas Issacharoff dated 3/17/2020 re: Request for Extension. Document filed by Centers for Disease Control and Prevention..(Issacharoff, Lucas) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-03-177LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Aaron Siri dated March 17, 2020 re: Opposition to Request for Extension. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network..(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-03-188ORDER re: 6 Letter filed by Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, 7 Letter filed by Informed Consent Action Network. The Court is in receipt of the Parties' letters dated March 17, 2020. ECF No. 6-7. Defendant's request is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before June 2, 2020. SO ORDERED., Centers for Disease Control and Prevention answer due 6/2/2020. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/18/2020) (rj) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar