Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00491
Date Filed2020-02-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffCAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY
Case DescriptionThe Campaign for Accountability submitted four FOIA requests to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning Title X teen pregnancy programs and opposition to those programs. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency the Campaign for Accountability filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-201COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6846736) filed by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons)(Huling, Alice) (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-02-202LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY (Huling, Alice) (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-02-21Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-02-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-03-174RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/26/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/27/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/26/20., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 2/25/2020 (Huling, Alice) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-03-205Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 03/20/2020)
2020-03-23MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before April 27, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 23, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 03/23/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar