Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2020-02-20 | 1 | COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6847325) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USAO, # 3 Summons U.S. Att'y General, # 4 Summons Dep't of the Interior, # 5 Summons Bureau of Land Management)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 02/20/2020) |
2020-02-20 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 02/20/2020) |
2020-02-21 | | Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/21/2020) |
2020-02-21 | 3 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/21/2020) |
2020-03-25 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of All Defendants (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 03/25/2020) |
2020-03-25 | 5 | ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 03/25/2020) |
2020-03-31 | | MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before April 14, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 31, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 03/31/2020) |
2020-03-31 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/14/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 04/01/2020) |
2020-04-14 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2020) |
2020-04-20 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before June 5, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 20, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 04/20/2020) |
2020-06-05 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/05/2020) |
2020-06-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before September 3, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 8, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 06/08/2020) |
2020-09-03 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 09/03/2020) |
2020-09-03 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before October 5, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 3, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/03/2020) |
2020-09-03 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/5/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 09/04/2020) |
2020-10-05 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 10/05/2020) |
2020-10-05 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before November 9, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 5, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 10/05/2020) |
2020-10-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/9/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 10/06/2020) |
2020-11-09 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 11/09/2020) |
2020-11-09 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before December 9, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 9, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 11/09/2020) |
2020-12-09 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 12/09/2020) |
2020-12-09 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before January 8, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 9, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 12/09/2020) |
2021-01-08 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 01/08/2021) |
2021-01-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before March 9, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 8, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 01/08/2021) |
2021-03-09 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 03/09/2021) |
2021-03-09 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before May 10, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 9, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 03/09/2021) |
2021-05-10 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 05/10/2021) |
2021-05-10 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before August 9, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 10, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 05/10/2021) |
2021-05-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/9/2021. (zjch) (Entered: 05/11/2021) |
2021-08-09 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 08/09/2021) |
2021-08-09 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before November 19, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 9, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 08/09/2021) |
2021-10-01 | | Case directly reassigned to Judge Florence Y. Pan. Judge Dabney L. Friedrich is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 10/01/2021) |
2021-11-19 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 11/19/2021) |
2021-11-22 | 17 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 11/22/2021) |
Hide Docket Events |