Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSPARACINO PLLC v. DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00497
Date Filed2020-02-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffSPARACINO PLLC
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Sparacino PLLC submitted four FOIA requests to the Defense Intelligence Agency for records concerning Jaysh-al-Mahdi or Hezbollah operatives, as well as records on the role of the Iraqi Ministry of Health in terrorist activities in Iraq. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency Sparacino PLLC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-201COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT against DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6848628) filed by SPARACINO PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons to DIA, # 8 Summons to DOJ, # 9 Summons to USAO DC)(Branson, Joshua) (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-02-202NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Edward Goldsmith on behalf of SPARACINO PLLC (Goldsmith, Andrew) (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-02-203NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Duffy on behalf of SPARACINO PLLC (Duffy, Matthew) (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-02-21Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-02-214SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (adh, ) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-02-285GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/28/2020. (jag) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-03-176RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/26/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/27/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Matthew) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-03-177RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/26/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Matthew) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-03-178RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 2/25/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Matthew) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-03-269Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Brobeck Declaration)(Moustakas, John) (Entered: 03/26/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar