Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleADAMS v. UNITED STATES NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00479
Date Filed2020-02-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffDALE B. ADAMS
DefendantUNITED STATES NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY (NSA)
DefendantJOHN R. CHAPMAN NSA FOIA/PA Chief
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-18Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 2/18/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-02-181COMPLAINT against JOHN R. CHAPMAN, UNITED STATES NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY filed by DALE B. ADAMS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (zmd) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-02-182MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DALE B. ADAMS (zmd) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-03-30MINUTE ORDER granting 2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Deputy Clerk shall assign this case as related to Adams v. CIA , No. 20-cv-377 (TNM). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/30/20.(ah) (Entered: 03/30/2020)
2020-03-31Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb) (Entered: 03/31/2020)
2020-03-313STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/31/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 03/31/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar