Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLATHAM & WATKINS LLP v. U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00509
Date Filed2020-02-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffLATHAM & WATKINS LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Latham & Watkins submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning two specific new drug applications submitted for drugs with the active ingredient cocaine hydrochloride manufactured by Lannett Company Genus Lifesciences. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency Latham & Watkins filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-211COMPLAINT against U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6852135) filed by LATHAM & WATKINS LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons for U.S. Food and Drug Administration, # 6 Summons for U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 7 Summons for U.S. Attorney General)(Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-02-212LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LATHAM & WATKINS LLP (Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-02-213NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by LATHAM & WATKINS LLP. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-00211. (Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-02-214NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan S. Baasch on behalf of LATHAM & WATKINS LLP (Baasch, Ryan) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-02-21Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-02-215SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-02-216STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/21/2020. (lctnm1) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-02-277RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/24/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/25/2020. (Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-03-248NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Viggiano Valdivia on behalf of U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 03/24/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar