Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00511
Date Filed2020-02-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Energy, the Department of Transportation, and the Department of State for records concerning communications between Sen. Mitch McConnell or his staff and any of the three agencies. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-211COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6852542) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-02-212LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Shaw, Khahilia) (Main Document 2 replaced on 2/28/2020) (znmw). (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-02-213LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (Corrected) by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-02-21Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-02-214SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-03-125RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/24/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/25/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/2/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY served on 3/2/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 3/2/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 3/2/2020 (Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-236NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of All Defendants (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 03/23/2020)
2020-03-237NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Pickell on behalf of All Defendants (Pickell, Lindsay) (Entered: 03/23/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar