Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJackson v. U.S. Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2020cv01276
Date Filed2020-02-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Virginia M. Kendall
PlaintiffShantique C. Jackson
Case DescriptionShantique Jackson submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning an incident in which Jackson was assaulted and detained by Joliet, Illinois police. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). Jackson filed an administrative appeal. The agency denied the appeal. Jackson then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-211COMPLAINT filed by SHANTIQUE C. JACKSON; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16750729. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-02-212ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff SHANTIQUE C. JACKSON by Matthew Vincent Topic (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-02-21CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, ) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-02-24SUMMONS Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (dxb, ) (Entered: 02/24/2020)
2020-02-243NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, ) (Entered: 02/24/2020)
2020-03-094MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 4/22/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 4/17/2020. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-135GENERAL ORDER signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: In view of the current situation regarding COVID19, the Court encourages counsel with motion or status hearings set over the next few weeks to (a) file a joint status report if they believe that the motion and/or status can be handled without an appearance simply by providing the Court with an update on the progress of the case or an indication that the relief requested in the motion either is unopposed or can be addressed with an agreed briefing schedule or (b) make arrangements to appear by telephone for all motions and status hearings that cannot be handled without an appearance. If you would like to appear by telephone for any hearing or status conference, please contact the Courtroom Deputy, Lynn Kandziora, preferably by email (Lynn_Kandziora@ilnd.uscourts.gov) or by telephone (312) 4085153, if necessary, to advise her of the case number and the name of the person who is expecting to participate. We will open the phone lines shortly before the start time every day that court is in session. Please use the Court's toll free call in number 877 848 7030, conference access code is 2413900. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, we ask that you keep your phone on mute until your case is called. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 3/13/2020: Mailed notice. (rp, ) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-166ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
2020-03-237DESIGNATION of Sarah Fattahi Terman as U.S. Attorney for Defendant U.S. Department of Justice (Terman, Sarah) (Entered: 03/23/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar