Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMacDougal v. U.S. Department of Justice
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2020cv01574
Date Filed2020-02-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Lewis J. Liman
PlaintiffIan MacDougal
Case DescriptionIan MacDougall, a freelance journalist, submitted a FOIA request to Justice Management Division at the Department of Justice for records concerning data from the Consolidated Asset Tracking System pertaining to real property subject to forfeiture where the property's address has been publicly disclosed. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, MacDougall filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [7]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-211CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(rdz) (Entered: 02/24/2020)
2020-02-212COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401255216)Document filed by Ian MacDougal.(rdz) (Entered: 02/24/2020)
2020-02-21Case Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 02/24/2020)
2020-02-21SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General..(rdz) (Entered: 02/24/2020)
2020-02-21Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (rdz) (Entered: 02/24/2020)
2020-02-284ORDER: Initial Conference set for 3/17/2020 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 15C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/28/2020) (va) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-03-095NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa A. Childs on behalf of U.S. Department of Justice..(Childs, Melissa) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-106JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for March 17, 2020 at 3:15 p.m. until after April 10, 2020 pending agency production or position for further scheduling addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from AUSA Melissa Childs and Pro Se Plantiff Ian MacDougall dated 03/10/2020. Document filed by U.S. Department of Justice..(Childs, Melissa) (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-03-107ORDER granting 6 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED. The parties shall submit a joint letter to the Court by April 10, 2020. The conference previously scheduled for March 17, 2020 is adjourned until April 14, 2020 at 3:30 p.m. The parties will not be required to submit a case management plan. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 4/14/2020 at 03:30 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 3/10/2020) (va) (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-03-258ANSWER to 2 Complaint. Document filed by U.S. Department of Justice..(Childs, Melissa) (Entered: 03/25/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar