Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGoebel v. Federal Aviation Administration
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2020cv00272
Date Filed2020-02-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeU.S. District Judge John C Coughenour
PlaintiffDavid Goebel
Case DescriptionDavid Goebel submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Aviation Administration for all records he had not received as part of his 2015 request for records on the Greener Skies Over Seattle Environmental Assessment. Goebel had filed an administrative appeal in relation to that request. His 2018 request asked for all records that he had not previously received. Goebel alleged that the FAA had destroyed some records responsive to his 2015 request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Goebel filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Aviation Administration an agency of the United States of America
DefendantFederal Aviation Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-211COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Federal Aviation Administration (Receipt # AWAWDC-6164601), filed by David Goebel. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Kampmeier, Paul) (Entered: 02/21/2020)
2020-02-24U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (CDA) (Entered: 02/24/2020)
2020-02-242Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Federal Aviation Administration (CDA) (Entered: 02/24/2020)
2020-02-253ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) (Entered: 02/25/2020)
2020-02-254MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at 206-370-8805 at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference set for 6/23/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) (Entered: 02/25/2020)
2020-02-255ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP) Modified on 2/26/2020 Disregard - Duplicative Clerical Error (PP). (Entered: 02/25/2020)
2020-03-196NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Matt Waldrop on behalf of Defendant Federal Aviation Administration. (Waldrop, Matt) (Entered: 03/19/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar