Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSCHRIER v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00538
Date Filed2020-02-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffMATTHEW SCHRIER
Case DescriptionMatthew Schirier, a photojournalist who had been captured and tortured by terrorists while covering the Syrian civil war, had sued the Qatar Islamic Bank, alleging it had financed the terrorists. Schirier submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of State for records concerning himself and Qatar Islamic Bank. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Schirier filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-241COMPLAINT Matthew Schrier against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE The Executive Office ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6858223) filed by Matthew Schrier. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carroll, Kevin) (Entered: 02/24/2020)
2020-02-25Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/25/2020)
2020-02-25SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (adh, ) (Entered: 02/25/2020)
2020-02-272REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE re 1 Complaint filed by MATTHEW SCHRIER. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by MATTHEW SCHRIER. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Carroll, Kevin) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-02-273STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 27, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-03-044SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(eg) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-175RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 3/5/2020 (Carroll, Kevin) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-03-176RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/05/2020. (Carroll, Kevin) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-03-177RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/5/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/4/2020. (Carroll, Kevin) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-04-068ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Lyons, Jane) (Entered: 04/06/2020)
2020-04-069Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings for Sixty Days by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Eric F. Stein, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lyons, Jane) (Entered: 04/06/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar