Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleKARA-MURZA v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00545
Date Filed2020-02-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffVLADIMIR KARA-MURZA
Case DescriptionVladimir Kara-Murza, a prominent pro-democracy activist in Russia who was poisoned while in Russia in 2015 and 2017, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning the results of tests the agency conducted on samples of Kara-Murza's blood in 2018 to determine what had caused his hospitalization in Russia. Kara-Murza also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but denied Kara-Murza's request for expedited processing. After Kara-Murza's counsel inquired about filing an administrative appeal he was told that since the FBI had not yet made an adverse determination, there was nothing to appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Kara-Murza filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-251COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6859865) filed by VLADIMIR KARA-MURZA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons as to AG, # 3 Summons as to USAO)(Siegel, Andrew) (Entered: 02/25/2020)
2020-02-252MOTION to Permit Plaintiff to Proceed Using Attorneys' Address by VLADIMIR KARA-MURZA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Siegel, Andrew) (Entered: 02/25/2020)
2020-02-253MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Samuel Howe, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6860801. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by VLADIMIR KARA-MURZA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Siegel, Andrew) (Entered: 02/25/2020)
2020-02-26Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/26/2020)
2020-02-264SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/26/2020)
2020-02-26MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that Samuel Ross Howe is admitted to represent Plaintiff pro hac vice in this case. The Court notes that Mr. Howe maintains an office within the District of Columbia and that his admission to the District of Columbia Bar is pending. In light of Local Civil Rule 83.2(c)(2), Mr. Howe is instructed to apply for admission to the Bar of this Court as soon as his admission to the District of Columbia Bar is complete. The Court also notes that the motion did not include the meet-and-confer statement required under the Local Rules for all non-dispositive motions. See D.D.C. Civ. R. 7(m). The parties are reminded for future reference that all motions must comply with the Local Rules. SO ORDERED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Clic k for instructions . Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on February 26, 2020. (lcrc3) (Entered: 02/26/2020)
2020-02-275NOTICE of Defendant's Consent by VLADIMIR KARA-MURZA re 2 MOTION to Permit Plaintiff to Proceed Using Attorneys' Address (Siegel, Andrew) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-03-05MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 2 Plaintiff's motion to proceed using attorneys' address and 5 Defendant's notice of consent to this motion, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff may proceed using his attorneys' address. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on March 5, 2020. (lcrc3) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-106RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/27/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/28/2020. (Siegel, Andrew) (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-03-137NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-248Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael G. Seidel, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 03/24/2020)
2020-03-24MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Defendant's consent motion to stay proceedings. It is hereby ORDERED that these proceedings, including Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint, are STAYED, and that Defendant shall promptly notify the Court after RIDS employees are able to return to their office. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, until RIDS employees are able to return to their office, Defendant shall provide Plaintiff with an informal report regarding the operating status of RIDS on April 1, 2020, and every 14 days thereafter. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on March 24, 2020. (lcrc3) (Entered: 03/24/2020)
2020-03-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/1/2020 (tj) (Entered: 03/24/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar