Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCALLIMACHI v. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00552
Date Filed2020-02-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffRUKMINI CALLIMACHI
Case DescriptionRukmini Callimachi, an international investigative reporter for the New York Times, submitted a FOIA request to the Clinton Presidential Library, part of the National Archives and Records Administration, for records concerning her step-father, Mihail Horia Botez, who was deceased. The Clinton Library acknowledged receipt of the request. The Clinton Library told Callimachi that it located 98 responsive pages but told her that 65 pages were being withheld under Exemption 1 (national security) and Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). The Clinton Library also told her that it had located an additional 409 pages which it would process over the next year. Callimachi filed an administrative appeal. The agency acknowledged receipt of the appeal. Two months later, it declassified some of the 65 pages previously withheld under Exemption 1. After hearing nothing further from the Clinton Library, Callimachi filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-251COMPLAINT against NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6862227) filed by RUKMINI CALLIMACHI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 02/25/2020)
2020-02-252NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of RUKMINI CALLIMACHI (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 02/25/2020)
2020-02-26Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/26/2020)
2020-02-263SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/9/2020) (adh, ). (Entered: 02/26/2020)
2020-03-274RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION served on 3/4/2020 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/27/2020)
2020-03-275RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/6/2020. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/27/2020)
2020-03-276RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/6/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/5/2020. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/27/2020)
2020-04-067NOTICE of Appearance by William Chang on behalf of NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION (Chang, William) (Entered: 04/06/2020)
2020-04-068ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION.(Chang, William) (Entered: 04/06/2020)
2020-04-06MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before April 21, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/6/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/06/2020)
2020-04-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/21/2020 (tj) (Entered: 04/06/2020)
2020-04-219Consent MOTION to Stay by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chang, William) (Entered: 04/21/2020)
2020-04-21MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Defendant's Consent Motion to Stay: It is hereby ORDERED that the proceedings in this case are STAYED until further order from the Court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before June 22, 2020, and that Defendant shall notify Plaintiff within seven days after the resumption of normal FOIA operations at the National Archives and Records Administration. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/21/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/21/2020)
2020-04-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/22/2020. (tj) (Entered: 04/21/2020)
2020-06-2210Joint STATUS REPORT by RUKMINI CALLIMACHI. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before August 22, 2020. Consistent with the Court's prior Minute Order (Apr. 21, 2020), Defendant shall also notify Plaintiff within seven days after the resumption of normal FOIA operations at the National Archives and Records Administration. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/22/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/22/2020. (tj) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-08-2111Joint STATUS REPORT by RUKMINI CALLIMACHI. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 08/21/2020)
2020-08-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before October 22, 2020. Consistent with the Court's prior Minute Order (Apr. 21, 2020), Defendant shall also notify Plaintiff within seven days after the resumption of normal FOIA operations at the National Archives and Records Administration. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/22/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 08/22/2020)
2020-08-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/22/2020 (tj) (Entered: 08/24/2020)
2020-10-2212Joint STATUS REPORT by RUKMINI CALLIMACHI. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/22/2020)
2020-10-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 12 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before December 22, 2020. Consistent with the Court's prior Minute Order (Apr. 21, 2020), Defendant shall also notify Plaintiff within seven days after the resumption of normal FOIA operations at the National Archives and Records Administration. SO ORDERED Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/22/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/22/2020)
2020-10-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/22/2020 (tj) (Entered: 10/29/2020)
2020-11-0313NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Robert Aaron Caplen on behalf of NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION Substituting for attorney William Chang (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 11/03/2020)
2020-12-2114Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 12/21/2020)
2020-12-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 14 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before February 22, 2021. Consistent with the Court's prior Minute Order (Apr. 21, 2020), Defendant shall also notify Plaintiff within seven days after the resumption of normal FOIA operations at the National Archives and Records Administration. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/21/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 12/21/2020)
2020-12-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/22/2021. (tj) (Entered: 12/21/2020)
2021-02-1815Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 02/18/2021)
2021-02-18MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 15 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on April 23, 2021. Consistent with the Court's prior Minute Order (Apr. 21, 2020), Defendant shall also notify Plaintiff within seven days after the resumption of normal FOIA operations at the National Archives and Records Administration. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/18/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/18/2021)
2021-02-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/23/2021 (tj) (Entered: 02/18/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar