Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00563
Date Filed2020-02-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Labor, the Department of Agriculture, the Department of Housing and Urban Development, the Department of Health and Human Services, and the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for records concerning communications each agency had with Stephen Miller. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. Several offices within the Labor Department responded to American Oversight's request. Having heard from none of the other agencies, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
DefendantCENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-261COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6864793) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons)(Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 02/26/2020)
2020-02-262LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Anthony, Katherine) (Entered: 02/26/2020)
2020-02-27Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-02-273SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-03-234NOTICE of Appearance by Mehreen A Rasheed on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Rasheed, Mehreen) (Main Document 4 replaced on 3/24/2020) (ztth). (Entered: 03/23/2020)
2020-03-235RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/27/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/28/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/2/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES served on 3/2/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE served on 3/2/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 3/2/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT served on 3/2/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR served on 3/2/2020 (Rasheed, Mehreen) (Entered: 03/23/2020)
2020-03-276NOTICE of Appearance by Kuntal Virendra Cholera on behalf of All Defendants (Cholera, Kuntal) (Main Document 6 replaced on 3/30/2020) (ztth). (Entered: 03/27/2020)
2020-03-277ANSWER to Complaint by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR.(Cholera, Kuntal) (Entered: 03/27/2020)
2020-03-30MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by April 13, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/30/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 03/30/2020)
2020-03-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/13/2020. (znbn) Modified on 3/30/2020 (znbn). (Entered: 03/30/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar