Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00570
Date Filed2020-02-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning HHS's Grant Regulation. Democracy Forward Foundation also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-261COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6865904) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Miller, Kristen) (Entered: 02/26/2020)
2020-02-262LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Miller, Kristen) (Entered: 02/26/2020)
2020-02-27Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-02-273SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-03-044RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES served on 2/28/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/02/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/2/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/1/2020.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Miller, Kristen) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-265NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Burch on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 03/26/2020)
2020-04-016ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES.(Burch, Alan) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar