Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJONG-FAST v. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00574
Date Filed2020-02-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffMOLLY JONG-FAST
Case DescriptionMolly Jong-Fast, a contributing editor at the Daily Beast, submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Veterans Affairs. Jong-Fast requested expediting processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. Jong-Fast also submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Justice. Jong-Fast requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged the requests. After hearing nothing further from either agency, Jong-Fast filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-271COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6868035) filed by MOLLY JONG-FAST. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DOJ, # 3 Summons USADC, # 4 Summons USAG, # 5 Summons VA)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-02-272ERRATA by MOLLY JONG-FAST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit corrected Complaint)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-02-27Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-02-273SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-03-054STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 03/05/20. (Attachment: Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-185RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS served on 3/3/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit VA receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
2020-03-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/4/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DOJ receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
2020-03-187RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/04/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USAG receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
2020-03-188RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/4/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/3/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USADC receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
2020-03-189MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by MOLLY JONG-FAST (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
2020-03-20MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 9 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint for failure to comply with this Court's Standing Order. See Standing Order, ECF No. 4 at 4 ("Any amended submissions shall be accompanied by a redline comparison of the original and amended pleading."). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/20/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 03/20/2020)
2020-03-2010MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by MOLLY JONG-FAST (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A (Complaint), # 3 Exhibit B (redlined FAC), # 4 Exhibit C (FAC), # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/20/2020)
2020-03-20MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is FORTHWITH DIRECTED to file the First Amended Complaint on the docket. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/20/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 03/20/2020)
2020-03-2111AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS filed by MOLLY JONG-FAST.(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/21/2020)
2020-03-3112Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 11 Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 03/31/2020)
2020-04-01MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re 11 Amended Complaint. Defendants shall file the Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by no later than April 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/1/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
2020-04-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer Or Otherwise Response To The Complaint due by 4/24/2020. (mac) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-04-0913ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Prescott Moss on behalf of MOLLY JONG-FAST (Moss, Bradley) Modified on 4/9/2020 (zjf). (Entered: 04/09/2020)
2020-04-09NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 13 Notice of Appearance was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading using their assigned login/password. (zjf) (Entered: 04/09/2020)
2020-04-1314NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Steven Zaid on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 04/13/2020)
2020-04-2415ANSWER to 11 Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS.(Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 04/24/2020)
2020-04-27MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA"), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than May 20, 2020. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of Plaintiff's FOIA requests; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA requests; (3) The anticipated date(s) for release of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA requests; (4) Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/27/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 04/27/2020)
2020-04-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 5/20/2020 (mac) (Entered: 04/28/2020)
2020-05-2016Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 05/20/2020)
2020-05-22MINUTE ORDER. In view of the 16 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than June 19, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/22/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 05/22/2020)
2020-05-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/19/2020. (mac) (Entered: 05/22/2020)
2020-06-1917Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
2020-06-22MINUTE ORDER. In view of 17 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than July 29, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 6/22/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/29/2020. (mac) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-07-2918Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 07/29/2020)
2020-07-2919NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kathleene A. Molen on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Sean M. Tepe (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 07/29/2020)
2020-07-30MINUTE ORDER. In view of 18 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with recommendations for further proceedings by no later than August 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/30/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 07/30/2020)
2020-07-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/28/2020 (mac) (Entered: 07/31/2020)
2020-08-2820Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 08/28/2020)
2020-09-01MINUTE ORDER. In view of 20 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than September 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/1/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 09/01/2020)
2020-09-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/28/2020. (mac) (Entered: 09/01/2020)
2020-09-2821Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/28/2020)
2020-09-30MINUTE ORDER. In view of 21 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than October 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/30/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-09-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/28/2020 (mac) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-10-2822Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-10-28MINUTE ORDER. In view of 22 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than December 4, 2020. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/28/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-10-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/4/2020 (mac) (Entered: 10/29/2020)
2020-12-0423Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 12/04/2020)
2020-12-08MINUTE ORDER. In view of 23 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than January 8, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/8/2020. (lcegs3) (Entered: 12/08/2020)
2020-12-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/6/2021 (mac) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
2021-01-0824Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 01/08/2021)
2021-01-12MINUTE ORDER. In view of 24 joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report with a recommendation for further proceedings by no later than February 10, 2021. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/12/2021. (lcegs3) (Entered: 01/12/2021)
2021-01-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/10/2021 (mac) (Entered: 01/13/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar