Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00583
Date Filed2020-02-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffCAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY
Case DescriptionThe Campaign for Accountability submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning the performance of Obria Group, Inc., a Title X grant recipient. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Campaign for Accountability filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-271COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6868824) filed by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Huling, Alice) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-02-272LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CAMPAIGN FOR ACCOUNTABILITY (Huling, Alice) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-02-27Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-02-273SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-03-054NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-245RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/28/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/29/2020. (Huling, Alice) (Entered: 03/24/2020)
2020-03-246RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/4/2020. (Huling, Alice) (Entered: 03/24/2020)
2020-03-247RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 3/3/2020 (Huling, Alice) (Entered: 03/24/2020)
2020-03-278ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 03/27/2020)
2020-04-01MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before April 15, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 1, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
2020-04-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/15/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar