Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCossio v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2020cv01437
Date Filed2020-02-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Steven C. Seeger
PlaintiffJose Antonio Cossio, Jr.
Case DescriptionJose Antonio Cossio submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Cossio filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-271RECEIVED Complaint and three copies by Jose Antonio Cossio, Jr (Attachments) (las, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-02-272CIVIL Cover Sheet (las, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-02-273PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Jose Antonio Cossio, Jr (las, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-02-274APPLICATION by Plaintiff Jose Antonio Cossio, Jr for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (las, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-02-277NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-03-168ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
2020-03-189ORDER In light of the public health situation, the Court encourages all parties and their counsel to take precautions, be reasonable, and use common sense in pending cases. In General Order No. 20-0012 dated March 16, 2020 (and amended on March 17), the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois extended all deadlines in civil cases by three weeks. Parties should assume that this Court will accommodate reasonable requests for extensions in the coming weeks, and counsel should show flexibility and accommodate each other too. This Court will grant a six-week extension of fact discovery if requested (and there is no need for an immediate request). Parties should not take depositions before April 17 unless (1) they take place telephonically; and (2) all parties and the witness(es) consent. Even a telephonic deposition often requires an in-person meeting to prepare the witness, so telephonic depositions can go forward only if everyone agrees. If any party or witness wants a deposition to take place in person, the deposition will take place after April 17. Needless to say, that date may change as the public health situation continues to evolve. Parties should continue to make progress in their cases when possible, but in a manner that is consistent with public health and safety. In the meantime, continue to work together cooperatively in the best traditions of our shared profession. The Court thanks all parties and their counsel for their patience and understanding during this difficult time.Signed by the Honorable Steven C. Seeger on 3/18/2020: Mailed notice. (docket1, ) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
2020-03-3010ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket12, ) (Entered: 03/31/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar