Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFarah v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictDistrict of Minnesota
CityDMN
Case Number0:2020cv00622
Date Filed2020-02-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge John R. Tunheim
PlaintiffMohamed Abdihamid Farah
Case DescriptionMohamed Abdihamid Farah submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning his prosecution. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Farah filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-271COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7518438) filed by Mohamed Abdihamid Farah. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kushner, Jordan) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-02-282TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-622 JRT/DTS. (KDS) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-02-283Summons Issued as to United States Department of Justice. (KDS) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-02-284Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint served on US DOJ on February 28, 2020, filed by Mohamed Abdihamid Farah., SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Mohamed Abdihamid Farah. United States Department of Justice served on 2/28/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Kushner, Jordan) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-03-115NOTICE of Appearance by Ana H Voss on behalf of United States Department of Justice. (Voss, Ana) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-276MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by United States Department of Justice. (Voss, Ana) (Entered: 03/27/2020)
2020-03-277PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by United States Department of Justice.(Voss, Ana) (Entered: 03/27/2020)
2020-03-318ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer United States Department of Justice answer due 4/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 3/31/2020. (TJB) (Entered: 03/31/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar