Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00593
Date Filed2020-02-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning the appointment of Daniel Richman as an employee of the FBI. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-281COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6873608) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-02-282LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-02-28Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-02-283SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (adh, ) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-02-284STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/28/2020. (lctnm1) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-03-245RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/5/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/4/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/23/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/5/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 03/24/2020)
2020-03-306Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael G. Seidel, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 03/30/2020)
2020-03-31MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall now respond on or before May 29, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/31/2020. (lctnm1) (Entered: 03/31/2020)
2020-03-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Complaint due by 5/29/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 03/31/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar