Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWESTERN VALUES PROJECT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00594
Date Filed2020-02-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Thomas F. Hogan
PlaintiffWESTERN VALUES PROJECT
Case DescriptionWestern Values Project submitted seven FOIA requests to the Department of Interior for records concerning communications to or from Secretary David Bernhardt's government or personal accounts. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Western Values Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-281COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6873987) filed by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USAO, # 3 Summons U.S. Att'y General, # 4 Summons Dep't of the Interior)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-02-282LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-02-28Case Assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-02-283SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-04-064ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 04/06/2020)
2020-04-06MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to confer and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request, and the anticipated date(s) for the release of requested documents that are still being processed, if any. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before April 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on April 6, 2020. (CR) (Entered: 04/06/2020)
2020-04-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/30/2020 (hs) (Entered: 04/06/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar