Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePIERCE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00600
Date Filed2020-02-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffGEORGE PIERCE
Case DescriptionGeorge Pierce submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning emails in the Outlook file of Patrol Agent in Charge Matthew Grupe pertaining to Pierce. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Grupe that it was closing his request because it was too vague. Grupe filed an administrative appeal of that decision. The agency upheld the decision. Grupe then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-281COMPLAINT against U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6874923) filed by GEORGE PIERCE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons)(Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-02-282NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of GEORGE PIERCE (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-02-283NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of GEORGE PIERCE (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-02-28Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-02-284SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/28/2020)
2020-03-035STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 3, 2020. (lcbah2) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-266NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of All Defendants (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 03/26/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar