Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleREYONOSO v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00625
Date Filed2020-03-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffAGUSTIN NUNEZ REYONOSO
Case DescriptionAgustin Nunez Reyonso, a federal prisoner, submitted FOIA requests to components of the Department of Justice for records concerning his prosecution and conviction. The components acknowledged receipt of the requests. The Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys, the DEA, and the Bureau of Prisons withheld records under Exemption 7 (law enforcement records). Reyonoso filed an administrative appeal to the Office of Information Policy. OIP upheld the agencies' decisions. Reyonoso then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Exemption 7 - Law enforcement records

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (DOJ)
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY (EOUSA)
DefendantDRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (DEA)
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-02Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 3/2/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-021COMPLAINT against DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by AGUSTIN NUNEZ REYONOSO. # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (zmd). (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-022MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by AGUSTIN NUNEZ REYONOSO. (zmd) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-023PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by AGUSTIN NUNEZ REYONOSO. (zmd) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-104ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $40.81 from Prison Account of AGUSTIN NUNEZ REYONOSO. and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/10/2020. (zmd) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-11Case Reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zmd) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar