Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWorth Rises et al v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2020cv01876
Date Filed2020-03-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Analisa Torres
PlaintiffWorth Rises
PlaintiffAmerican Oversight
Case DescriptionWorth Rise and American Oversight submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning communications with outside parties. The agency acknowledged the requests. Worth Rise and American Oversight also submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning communications to and from the Bureau of Prisons pertaining to specific entities. The agency acknowledged the request. After hearing nothing further from either agency, Worth Rise and American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantU.S. Department Of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-031COMPLAINT against U.S. Department Of Justice, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18990999)Document filed by Worth Rises, American Oversight..(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-032CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-033REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Oversight, Worth Rises..(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-034REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Oversight, Worth Rises..(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-035REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Oversight, Worth Rises..(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-036RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Oversight..(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-037RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Worth Rises..(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 03/03/2020)
2020-03-04CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(pc) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-04Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (pc) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-04Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-048INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 5/11/2020 at 11:20 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/4/2020) (cf) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-049ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (As further set forth in this Order.) The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/4/2020) (cf) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-0510ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security..(pc) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-0511ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department Of Justice..(pc) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-0512ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(pc) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-2313NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kirti Vaidya Reddy on behalf of U.S. Department Of Justice, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Reddy, Kirti) (Entered: 03/23/2020)
2020-03-2414FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PRO HAC VICE MOTION - MOTION for Mehreen Aasya Rasheed to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19209307. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Oversight. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order).(Rasheed, Mehreen) Modified on 3/24/2020 (ad). (Entered: 03/24/2020)
2020-03-24>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 14 MOTION for Mehreen Aasya Rasheed to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19209307. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The certificate of good standing must be issued by the Clerk of the Supreme Court of Virginia 100 North 9th Street 5th Floor Richmond, VA 23219 804-786-2251;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (ad) (Entered: 03/24/2020)
2020-03-3115AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE) of Summons and Complaint, served. U.S. Department Of Justice served on 3/11/2020, answer due 4/10/2020; U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 3/11/2020, answer due 4/10/2020; U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 3/11/2020, answer due 4/10/2020. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Worth Rises; American Oversight..(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 03/31/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar