Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. ELECTION ASSISTANCE COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00633
Date Filed2020-03-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted three FOIA requests to the Federal Election Assistance Commission for records concerning directives and guidance issued by the Commission as well as communications between Commission staff, the White House, and outside parties. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantELECTION ASSISTANCE COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-041COMPLAINT against ELECTION ASSISTANCE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6888137) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Lewis, Emma) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-042LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Lewis, Emma) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-04Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-043SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ELECTION ASSISTANCE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (adh, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-04-064NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Federighi on behalf of ELECTION ASSISTANCE COMMISSION (Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 04/06/2020)
2020-04-065ANSWER to Complaint by ELECTION ASSISTANCE COMMISSION.(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 04/06/2020)
2020-04-066ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before April 20, 2020. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/06/2020. (lcapm2) (Entered: 04/06/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar