Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCHAVIS v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00638
Date Filed2020-03-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffMICHAEL R. CHAVIS
Case DescriptionMichael Chavis, an investigator for the Public Defender Services of Eastern Tennessee, submitted a FOIA request to the Drug Enforcement Administration for records concerning the case of Ricardo Sanchez, who was being represented by the Public Defender Services of Eastern Tennessee. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency disclosed 107 pages but withheld 225 pages. Chavis filed an administrative appeal of the decision. The agency upheld its decision on appeal. Chavis then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-041COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by MICHAEL R. CHAVIS. (Attachments: # 1 A: Aug. 9, 2018 FOIA Request, # 2 B: Sept. 4, 2018 DEA Response, # 3 C: Sept. 11, 2018 Certificate of Identity, # 4 D: Sept. 18, 2108 DEA Response, # 5 E: Oct. 12, 2018 DEA Response, # 6 F: Dec. 18, 2018 DEA Response, # 7 G: Jan. 8, 2019 Appeal Confirmation, # 8 H: Jan. 21, 2020 DOJ Denial, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons USDOJ, # 11 Summons DEA, # 12 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 13 Summons U.S. Attorney District of Columbia)(Kissinger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-05Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-052SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-053STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/5/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar