Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCHAVIS v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00639
Date Filed2020-03-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffDANA C. HANSEN CHAVIS
Case DescriptionDana Chavis, an attorney for the Public Defender Services of Eastern Tennessee, submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco and Firearms for records concerning the case of David Runyon, who was being represented by the Public Defender Services of Eastern Tennessee. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). Chavis filed an administrative appeal of that decision with the Office of Information Policy. OIP upheld the BATF's decision. Chavis then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantBUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-041COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by DANA C. HANSEN CHAVIS. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A: Jun. 15, 2016 FOIA/PA Request, # 2 Attachment B: Jun. 21, 2016 ATF Response, # 3 Attachment C: Jul. 18, 2016 Certificate of Identity, # 4 Attachment D: Nov. 1, 2018 ATF Denial, # 5 Attachment E: Jan. 7, 2019 Appeal Denial, # 6 Attachment F: May 21, 2019 USDOJ Appeal Denial, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons ATF, # 9 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 10 Summons USDOJ, # 11 Summons U.S. Attorney District of Columbia)(Kissinger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-05Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-052SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS AND EXPLOSIVES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-053STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 5, 2020. (lcbah4) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar