Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case Title GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY LAW CENTER CIVIL RIGHTS CLINIC v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00640
Date Filed2020-03-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffGEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY LAW CENTER CIVIL RIGHTS CLINIC
Case DescriptionThe Georgetown University Law Center Civil Rights Clinic submitted four FOIA requests to the Department of Housing and Urban Development for records concerning communications with the housing industry pertaining to its statutory obligation to provide fair housing. The agency did not acknowledge the requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Civil Rights Clinic filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-041COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6889171) filed by GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY LAW CENTER CIVIL RIGHTS CLINIC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Civil Cover Sheet, # 14 Summons)(Abraham, Heather). (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-052ERRATA as to Complaint by GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY LAW CENTER CIVIL RIGHTS CLINIC 1 Complaint, filed by GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY LAW CENTER CIVIL RIGHTS CLINIC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Civil Cover Sheet, # 14 Summons)(Abraham, Heather) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-05Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-053SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-054STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 5, 2020. (lcbah4) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-055REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by GEORGETOWN UNIVERSITY LAW CENTER CIVIL RIGHTS CLINIC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Abraham, Heather) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-206SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/20/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar