Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFARM LABOR ORGANIZING COMMITTEE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00645
Date Filed2020-03-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffFARM LABOR ORGANIZING COMMITTEE
Case DescriptionThe Farm Labor Organizing Committee submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Labor for records concerning the results of agency investigations in which farmers were found to have improperly sold tobacco. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request under Exemption 4 (confidential business information). The Committee filed an administrative appeal. The agency acknowledged receipt of the appeal but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Committee filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-051COMPLAINT against FARM LABOR ORGANIZING COMMITTEE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6891464) filed by FARM LABOR ORGANIZING COMMITTEE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to United States Attorney, # 3 Summons to Attorney General, # 4 Summons to U.S. Department of Labor)(Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-052LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FARM LABOR ORGANIZING COMMITTEE (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-05Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-053SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-094RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/5/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/4/2020. (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 03/09/2020)
2020-03-195GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 3/19/2020. (jag) (Entered: 03/19/2020)
2020-04-016NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
2020-04-017NOTICE Regarding Intent to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
2020-04-068ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR.(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 04/06/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar