Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00647
Date Filed2020-03-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Labor for records concerning the status of an administrative proceeding against Oracle. DFF also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency asked DFF for a 40-day extension in which to respond. After hearing nothing further from the agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-051COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6892072) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Jones, Karianne) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-052LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Jones, Karianne) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-05Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-053SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-054STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 5, 2020. (lcbah1) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-125RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR served on 3/6/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/09/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/9/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/8/2020.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Jones, Karianne) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-266NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Michelle Kopplin on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR (Kopplin, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/26/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar