Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00652
Date Filed2020-03-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning guidance to staff on asylum issues. American Oversight also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and granted American Oversight's fee waiver requests. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of the requests, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-051COMPLAINT against U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6893055) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons as to USAO, # 3 Summons as to AG, # 4 Summons as to DHS, # 5 Summons as to USCIS)(Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-052LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-05Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-053SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-04-034RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/24/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/23/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/26/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 3/25/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 3/25/2020 (Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 04/03/2020)
2020-04-075AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Summons as to U.S. Attorney's Office, # 2 Summons as to Attorney General, # 3 Summons as to CBP)(Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 04/07/2020)
2020-04-086Summons (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (ztth); Modified text on 4/9/2020 (ztth). (Entered: 04/08/2020)
2020-04-087SUMMONS (2) REISSUED Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ztth) (ztth). Modified text on 4/9/2020 and to attach Summonses (ztth). (Entered: 04/08/2020)
2020-04-278NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Aaron Caplen on behalf of All Defendants (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 04/27/2020)
2020-04-279Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 5 Amended Complaint, by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 04/27/2020)
2020-04-27MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall have up to and including May 8, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to 5 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/27/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/27/2020)
2020-04-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/8/2020. (tj) (Entered: 04/28/2020)
2020-05-0610RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/20/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/20/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 4/20/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 4/17/2020 (Shaw, Khahilia) (Entered: 05/06/2020)
2020-05-0811ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint, by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 05/08/2020)
2020-05-11MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before May 25, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/11/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/11/2020)
2020-05-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 5/25/2020. (tj) (Entered: 05/12/2020)
2020-05-2612Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
2020-05-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 12 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before June 26, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/27/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/27/2020)
2020-05-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/26/2020 (tj) (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-06-2613Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-26MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 13 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before July 28, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/26/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-06-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/28/2020 (tj) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar