Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWRIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00653
Date Filed2020-03-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffGRETTA WRIGHT Federal Defender Services of Eastern Tennessee, Inc.
Case DescriptionGretta Wright, a paralegal at the Federal Public Defenders Service for Eastern Tennessee, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning the conviction of Terry Lynn King, who was being represented by the Federal Public Defenders Service for Eastern Tennessee. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Wright filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DefendantU.S. MARSHALS SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-03-051COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by GRETTA WRIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attach. 1 July 25, 2019 DOJ Press Release, # 2 Exhibit Attach. 2 Notice and Addendum to BOP Protocol filed in Roane v. Barr U.S. Dist. Ct. case, # 3 Exhibit Attach. 3 Excerpt from Application for Stay or Vacatur filed in U.S. Supreme Court, # 4 Exhibit Attach. 4 DOJ OIP FOIA Request, # 5 Exhibit Attach. 5 DOJ OIP Acknowledgment Letter, # 6 Exhibit Attach. 6 BOP FOIA Request, # 7 Exhibit Attach. 7 BOP Acknowledgment Letter, # 8 Exhibit Attach. 8 DEA FOIA Request, # 9 Exhibit Attach. 9 USMS FOIA Request, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 11 Summons Hon. William P. Barr, Attorney General, # 12 Summons Hon. Timothy J. Shea, U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 13 Summons U.S. Department of Justice, # 14 Summons Federal Bureau of Prisons, # 15 Summons U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration, # 16 Summons U.S. Marshals Service)(Kissinger, Stephen) (Entered: 03/05/2020)
2020-03-06Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/06/2020)
2020-03-062SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/06/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar